Steilman v. Michael et al
Petitioner: Derrick E. Steilman
Respondent: Reginald D. Michael and Attorney General of the State of Montana
Case Number: 2:2019cv00038
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Referring Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
2 Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO #5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Derrick E. Steilman. (TAG)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Request for Counsel DENIED. Show Cause Response due by 9/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 8/15/2019. Mailed to Steilman (TAG)
August 5, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number MTX9-13992 (TAG)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian Morris and Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto for all further proceedings. Jeremiah C. Lynch no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/5/2019. (CDH)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Mailed to Steilman with docket sheet (TAG)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from Steilman re Fling Fee (TAG)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 not paid), filed by Derrick E. Steilman. (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steilman v. Michael et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Reginald D. Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Montana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Derrick E. Steilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?