Morgan et al v. RSUI Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Renee Andrews, Robert Orsello and Murray Morgan
Defendant: RSUI Indemnity Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00043
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by RSUI Indemnity Company re #9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Mikulaninec, Kevin)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman regarding the requirements of CM/ECF registration. Copy of Order #9 and letter mailed to PHV Counsel. (HEG)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion of Kevin G. Mikulaninec to Appear Pro Hac Vice subject to conditions. FURTHER ORDERED: This Order will be withdrawn unless Mikulaninec, within fifteen ( 15) days from the date of this Order, files an acknowledgment and acceptance of his admission under the terms set forth above. Copy of order and affidavit provided to Sarah N. to add attorney information into CM. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/30/2019. (HEG)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/22/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/22/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2019 at 01:30 PM at the Chambers of District Judge Sam E. Haddon, Paul G. Hatfield Courthouse, Helena, Montana. Lead counsel for each party is to attend in person. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/27/2019. (HEG)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION Kevin G. Mikulaninec to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2371910.) Gary M. Zadick appearing for Defendant RSUI Indemnity Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kevin G. Mikulaninec, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Zadick, Gary)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses by RSUI Indemnity Company. (Zadick, Gary)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT filed by Murray Morgan, Renee Andrews and Robert Orsello in state court on July 11, 2019. (ASG)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of receipt of state court case via file sharing program. (Attachments: #1 2_Summons Issd, #2 3_Summons Filed, #3 4_Notice of Filing) (ASG)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by RSUI Indemnity Company. Amendment to #2 Order, Amended Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Docket Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zadick, Gary)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal filed by RSUI Indemnity Company. This case will be remanded to state court on August 23, 2019, unless Defendant files an amended notice of removal properly alleging jurisdiction on or before that date. Signed by Judge Sam E. Haddon on 8/16/2019. (NOS)
August 14, 2019 Filing fee of $400 received; receipt number 0977-2352261. (NOS)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fifth Judicial District Court, Madison County, case number DV 29-2019-40, filed by RSUI Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Docket Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan et al v. RSUI Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Andrews
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Alke
Represented By: Elizabeth Mary Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Orsello
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Alke
Represented By: Elizabeth Mary Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murray Morgan
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Alke
Represented By: Elizabeth Mary Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSUI Indemnity Company
Represented By: Gary M. Zadick
Represented By: James R. Zadick
Represented By: Kevin G. Mikulaninec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?