Collins v. Fox et al
Plaintiff: Mark William Collins
Defendant: John A Micu, Chad Wright, Morgan Smith, Mark Hilyard, Tim Fox, Chris Miller and Scott Howard
Case Number: 2:2019cv00044
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE ( 1 pg.) re Filing fee by Mark William Collins. Filing fee of $400 received 9/5/19; receipt number MTX9-1490. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (5 pgs.)) (TAG)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 Brief/Response to Order re #4 Order filed by Mark William Collins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (TAG)
September 5, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number MTX9-1490 (TAG)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to file account statement in support of #1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis on or before 9/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 8/29/2019. (MPB) (Copy mailed to Collins on 8/29/2019.) (NOS)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Collins with docket sheet (TAG)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Mark William Collins. (Attachments: #1 Appendices/Exhibits, #2 Affidavit, #3 Summons) (TAG)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Mark William Collins. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Fox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark William Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A Micu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hilyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?