Fuchs et al v. Old Republic Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Eric Fuchs and Melissa Fuchs
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company, Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. and John Does 1-3
Case Number: 2:2019cv00047
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Counts One and Three filed by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.. (Williams, Mark) Modified on 10/23/2019 (KJL).
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Counts One and Three Mark S. Williams appearing for Defendant Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. (Williams, Mark) Modified on 10/23/2019 to correct docket text (KJL).
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Fuchs, Eric Fuchs. Old Republic Insurance Company served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Ruggiero, Jory)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. on September 18, 2019, filed by Eric Fuchs, Melissa Fuchs. (Ruggiero, Jory)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., Old Republic Insurance Company. Originals mailed to Counsel. (ASG)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Melissa Fuchs, Eric Fuchs. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuchs et al v. Old Republic Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Fuchs
Represented By: Jory C. Ruggiero
Represented By: Domenic A. Cossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Fuchs
Represented By: Jory C. Ruggiero
Represented By: Domenic A. Cossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander T. Tsomaya
Represented By: Mark S. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?