Friedlund v. Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Tammy Friedlund
Defendant: ABC LLCs, Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, Cunningham Lindsey U.S., Inc., John Does 1-10 and ABC Corps.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00051
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Remark from Clerk of Court: The Plaintiff has filed an Amended Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Complaint Against Mountain West Farm Bureau (Doc. 9). Therefore, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(i), Defendant Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company is dismissed without further order of the Court. (NOS)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tammy Friedlund. (Karem, Thomas) (Modified on 11/21/2019; Amended Notice of Dismissal filed upon request of clerk's office; complete document attached in entirety, NEF regenerated.) (NOS)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tammy Friedlund (Karem, Thomas)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by Cunningham Lindsey U.S., Inc.. (Pavuk, Daniela)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order. Joint Proposed Discovery Plan due by 1/21/2020. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 1/21/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2020 at 11:00 AM in Helena, MT before Judge Sam E Haddon. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 11/15/2019. (JEH)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, Cunningham Lindsey U.S., Inc., ABC Corps., ABC LLCs, and John Does 1-10 filed by Tammy Friedlund. (Originally filed in Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, Cause No. DV-16-740A.) (NOS)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE from Gallatin County District Court. (Attachments: #1 2 - Court's Notice, #2 3 - Motion for Extension, #3 4 - Order granting extension, #4 5 - Summons, MT West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, #5 6 - Summons, Cunningham Lindsey U.S., #6 7 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal). (Original file shelved in Butte Clerk's Office.) (NOS)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cunningham Lindsey U.S., Inc.. (Pavuk, Daniela)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cunningham Lindsey U.S., Inc.. (Pavuk, Daniela)
October 11, 2019 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number MTX100016558. (NOS)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, case number DV-16-740A, filed by Cunningham Lindsey U.S., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Filings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friedlund v. Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC LLCs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cunningham Lindsey U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Marina Horsting
Represented By: Daniela E. Pavuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corps.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Friedlund
Represented By: Thomas J. Karem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?