Trenary v. Safariland Group et al
Plaintiff: Lynn Trenary
Defendant: Safariland Group, The Safariland Group, Roes 1-3, Does 1-3 and Safariland LLC of Jacksonville Florida
Case Number: 2:2019cv00056
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 1/24/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 1/24/2020. A preliminary pretrial conference to develop a case management plan will be held at 1:00 p.m. on February 4, 2020, at the Chambers of District Judge Sam E. Haddon, Paul G. Hatfield Courthouse, Helena, Montana. Lead counsel for each party is to attend in person. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/18/2019. (HEG)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Safariland Group, filed by Lynn Trenary. (APP) (State court file sent electronically via email.) (NOS) (NOS)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT PLEADINGS (Attachments: #1 State Court Summons, #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Notice of Filing) (APP) (State court file sent electronically via email.) (NOS)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Keif Alexander Storrar on behalf of Lynn Trenary (Storrar, Keif)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Safariland Group. (Lay, Kenneth)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re: #4 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Summons, #2 Exhibit C - Service of Process, #3 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Federal Court) (Lay, Kenneth)
November 11, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Safariland Group. (Lay, Kenneth)
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safariland Group. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lay, Kenneth) (Docket text modified on 11/14/2019.) (NOS)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. This case will be remanded to state court on November 13, 2019, unless Defendant files an amended notice of removal properly alleging jurisdiction on or before that date. Signed by Judge Sam E. Haddon on 11/8/2019. (NOS)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safariland Group identifying Corporate Parent Maui Acquisition Corp. for Safariland Group.. (Lay, Kenneth)
November 4, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2393642 (KJL)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safariland Group from Montana Second Judicial District Court, Butte-Silver Bow County, case number DV-19-150., filed by Safariland Group. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Exhibit B - Summons, #4 Exhibit C - Service of Process) (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trenary v. Safariland Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safariland Group
Represented By: Kenneth K. Lay
Represented By: John Mark Semmens
Represented By: Christopher C. Voigt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Safariland Group
Represented By: Kenneth K. Lay
Represented By: John Mark Semmens
Represented By: Christopher C. Voigt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roes 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safariland LLC of Jacksonville Florida
Represented By: Kenneth K. Lay
Represented By: John Mark Semmens
Represented By: Christopher C. Voigt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Trenary
Represented By: Richard J. Pyfer
Represented By: Keif Alexander Storrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?