Jones v. MESA Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: David Jones
Defendant: MESA Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00059
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MESA Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company from Montana Second Judicial District Court, Silver Bow County, case number DV-19-359. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0977-2407977), filed by MESA Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Acknowledgement and Waiver of Service of a Summons) (Luck, Bradley)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED: This case will be remanded to state court on January 10, 2020, unless Defendant files an amended notice of removal properly alleging jurisdiction on or before that date. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/27/2019. (HEG)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand by MESA Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company. (Luck, Bradley)
December 5, 2019 Remark: Amanda Hunter is now a register e-filer and will receive electronic notifications. (HEG)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MESA Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Selective Insurance Group, Inc. for MESA Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company.. (Luck, Bradley)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against MESA Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company, filed by David Jones. (APP)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT PLEADINGS (Attachments: #1 Summons and return of service, #2 Acknowledgment and waiver of summons, #3 Motion for substitution, #4 Notice of filing, #5 Notice of removal, #6 Transmittal letter) (APP) (State court documents transferred via email to clerk's office.) (NOS)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from Clerk of Court to Counsel Hunter. (NOS)
December 2, 2019 Filing fee: $400 paid, receipt number 0977-2407977. (ASG)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MESA Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company from Montana Second Judicial District Court, Silver Bow County, case number DV-19-359. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Verified Complaint, #2 Ex B - Summons, #3 Ex C - Acknowledgment, #4 civil cover sheet) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. MESA Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MESA Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradley J. Luck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Jones
Represented By: David L. Vicevich
Represented By: Amanda D. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?