Powers v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Mary Powers
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00062
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case management plan due 3/25/2020. (JEH)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order: The parties shall file the case management plan on or before March 25, 2020. See Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/29/2020. (JEH)
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.. (Howard, Gary)
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Howard, Gary)
January 14, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Cassie Moyer on January 7, 2020, filed by Mary Powers. (Cok, Jonathan)
December 13, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2414705 (KJL)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Original mailed to plaintiff's counsel. (KJL)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, filed by Mary Powers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powers v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Powers
Represented By: Michael D. Cok
Represented By: Jonathan M. Cok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary Lane Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?