Chattin v. Sims
Plaintiff: Patrick B. Chattin
Defendant: Marissa Sims
Case Number: 2:2019cv00065
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE of REMOVAL by Marissa Sims. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Medearis, Jesse) (Text modified.) (NOS)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED: This case will be remanded to state court on January 17, 2020, unless Defendant files an amended notice of removal properly alleging jurisdiction on or before that date. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/9/2020. (HEG)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Marissa Sims, filed by Patrick B. Chattin on October 15, 2019. (NOS)
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE. (Attachments: #1 2 - Summons, #2 3 - Notice of Removal) Original file held in Butte clerk's office. (NOS)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Marissa Sims. (Medearis, Jesse)
December 26, 2019 Filing fee of $400 received; receipt number 0977-2419591. (NOS)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, case number DV-1177A, filed by Marissa Sims. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chattin v. Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marissa Sims
Represented By: Jesse C. Medearis
Represented By: Nicholas John Pagnotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick B. Chattin
Represented By: Bridget W. leFeber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?