FX Solutions, Inc. v. Goettsche
Plaintiff: FX Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Matthew Brent Goettsche
Case Number: 2:2020cv00003
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Referring Judge: Sam E Haddon
2 Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER STAYING CASE until April 22, 2020, and setting Telephonic Status Conference for 4/23/2020 at 02:00 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 3/3/2020. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM-KLD (APP)
March 3, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION by Kevin Washington. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM-KLD (McLean, Kris) Modified on 3/3/2020 to change event to "stipulated motion". (SLR).
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1) Cause No. CV-20-02-BU-BMM-KLD remains assigned to the Honorable Brian Morris, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings and entry of judgment; 2) Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), Cause No. CV-20-02-BU-BMM-KLD is referred to the Honorable Kathleen L. Desoto, United States Magistrate Judge, who will conduct all necessary hearings and submit to the undersigned proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of all motions excepted from the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction by 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); 3) Cause No. CV-20-03-BU-BMM remains assigned to the Honorable Brian Morris, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings and entry of judgment; 4) Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), Cause No. CV-20-03-BU-BMM is referred to the Honorable Kathleen L. Desoto, United States Magistrate Judge, who will conduct all necessary hearings and submit to the undersigned proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of all motions excepted from the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction by 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/27/2020. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM (SLR)
February 27, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto added. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (SLR)
February 13, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyson A. McLean on behalf of FX Solutions, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM (McLean, Tyson)
February 7, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Correction: re (37 in 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 14 in 2:20-cv-00003-BMM) Brief/Memorandum in Support, (13 in 2:20-cv-00003-BMM, 36 in 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD) MOTION to Stay . The filing error relates to: Signature and Login Do not Match. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM (SLR)
February 7, 2020 Filing 14 Brief/Memorandum in Support re (13 in 2:20-cv-00003-BMM) MOTION to Stay filed by Matthew Brent Goettsche. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM (Brooke, Nicholas)
February 7, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Nicholas Kirby Brooke appearing for Defendant Matthew Brent Goettsche Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM (Brooke, Nicholas)
January 31, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Matthew Brent Goettsche. All Defendants. (Smith, John)
January 28, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Matthew Brent Goettsche on 1/14/2020, filed by FX Solutions, Inc.. (McLean, Kris)
January 28, 2020 Set Deadlines: Matthew Brent Goettsche answer due 2/7/2020. (SLR)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPROVING LOAN AGREEMENT regarding 30 Motion in case 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/22/2020. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM (MMS)
January 17, 2020 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 01/10/2020 before Judge Morris. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER, the clerks office, or the court reporter. NOTICE: A NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION MUST BE FILED WITHIN 7 DAYS OF THIS FILING. Contact court reporter Yvette Heinze, 406-422-8619, yvettecsrrpr@gmail.com. For further information, please see the Transcript Redaction Procedure and Schedule on the Court Reporters page of our website.. Redaction Request due 2/7/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2020. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM (YMH)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Matthew Brent Goettsche, filed by Kevin Washington. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM (APP)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 STATE COURT PLEADINGS (Attachments: #1 State Court Motion, #2 State Court Brief, #3 State Court Order, #4 State Court Certificate of Service, #5 State Court Certificate of Notice, #6 State Court Notice of Rremoval) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM (APP)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Consolidate is GRANTED. Case Number CV-20-03-BU-SEH is hereby REASSIGNED to the undersigned and will henceforth be numbered CV-20-03-BU-BMM. Pursuant to Section 8(h) of the Guide for Filing in the District of Montana, all documents shall be e-filed in the LEAD CASE (CV-20-02-BU-BMM-KLD) and spread to the MEMBER CASE (CV-20-03-BU-BMM) unless otherwise ordered. When prompted to spread, users should answer "yes". Users may contact the Clerks Office for assistance in filing documents. Cases in case 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/14/2020. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM (SLR)
January 12, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Joinder by Matthew Brent Goettsche re: #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M to Consolidate) (Brooke, Nicholas)
January 10, 2020 Set Deadlines: Amended Notice of Removal due by 1/17/2020. (HEG)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED: This case will be remanded to state court on January 17, 2020, unless Defendant files an amended notice of removal properly alleging jurisdiction on or before that date. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/9/2020. (HEG)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Matthew Brent Goettsche, filed by FX Solutions, Inc. (APP)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT PLEADINGS (Attachments: #1 State Court Notice of Removal) (APP)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Matthew Brent Goettsche from Montana Second Judicial District Court, case number 19-452. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 state court complaint) (ASG)
January 7, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2423807 (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FX Solutions, Inc. v. Goettsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Brent Goettsche
Represented By: Nicholas Kirby Brooke
Represented By: John E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FX Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Kris McLean
Represented By: Tyson A. McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?