Consort et al v. Northwest Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Gillian Consort and James Consort
Defendant: Davey Tree, Inc., Northwest Corporation and Northwestern Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv00010
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Butte-Silver Bow County Receipt Confirmation. (HEG)
April 27, 2020 Remark: Remand letter, docket sheet and hard copies of filed documents in our case mailed to Second Judicial District Court, Butte-Silver Bow County. (HEG)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED: Defendant North Western Corporation has been afforded two separate opportunities to properly plead jurisdiction. It has twice failed to do so. This action is remanded to Montana's Second Judicial District Court, Butte-Silver Bow County. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 4/24/2020. (HEG)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Remand. Plaintiffs may, upon showing of good cause, move to resubmit the remand motion and brief in support in proper form. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/31/2020. (HEG)
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand Jeffrey Wade Dahood appearing for Plaintiffs Gillian Consort, James Consort (Dahood, Jeffrey)
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Northwestern Corporation. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Tom Powers, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy Olson, #3 Affidavit of Patrick T. Fleming, #4 Exhibit) (Fleming, Patrick)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED: This case will be remanded to state court on March 26, 2020, unless Defendant NorthWestern Corporation files an amended notice of removal and otherwise takes all steps necessary to establish of record that this Court's jurisdiction has appropriately been invoked. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/19/2020. (HEG)
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT FOR DESTRUCTION OF PROPERTY AND EMOTIONAL DISTRESS AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Davey Tree, Inc., Northwestern Corporation, filed by James Consort, Gillian Consort. (HEG) Modified on 3/17/2020 TO CORRECT TEXT (HEG).
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Butte Silver-Bow County Case Register Report. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Transmittal Letter) (HEG)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman, regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. Copy mailed to Wade Dahood. (NOS)
March 11, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2455441 (TAG)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Northwest Corporation from Montana Second Judicial District Court, Silver Bow County, case number DV-20-13. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Consort et al v. Northwest Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gillian Consort
Represented By: Jeffrey Wade Dahood
Represented By: Wade Dahood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Consort
Represented By: Jeffrey Wade Dahood
Represented By: Wade Dahood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davey Tree, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Corporation
Represented By: Patrick T. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwestern Corporation
Represented By: Patrick T. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?