LeProwse et al v. Patterson Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gia M. LeProwse and Paul LeProwse
Defendant: Patterson Companies, Inc., Patterson Dental Company, Whip-Mix Corporation and Patterson Dental Supply, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00036
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Owen Reed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Reed, Joshua)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/21/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/21/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/21/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2020 at 02:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS** Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/16/2020. (ACC)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Honorable Brian Morris. The referral is TERMINATED and the Honorable Magistrate Judge John Johnston no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/16/2020. (ACC)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Whip-Mix Corporation. (Sorenson Brotten, Elizabeth)
August 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Patterson Companies, Inc., Patterson Dental Supply, Inc. (McCann, M. Christy)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 Mailing of Consent - Honorable John Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel John F. Lacey, Ethan A. Welder, Leo S. Ward, M. Christy S. McCann, Elizabeth M. Sorenson Brotten. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 9/14/2020. (ACC)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan A. Welder on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Welder, Ethan)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Lacey on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lacey, John)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Complaint with Jury Demand by Patterson Companies, Inc., Patterson Dental Supply, Inc.. (McCann, M. Christy)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT (State Court) against All Defendants.. (MMS)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE re 1 Notice of Removal, from Montana Second Judicial District Court, Butte Silver Bow County, consisting of (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Notice of Consent to Accept Electronic Service, #3 Affidavit of Service - Ann Steinbock, #4 Affidavit of Service - Coffman, #5 Affidavit of Service - Minnesota, #6 Notice of Appearance, #7 Answer, #8 Notice of Removal) (MMS)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Patterson Companies, Inc. and Patterson Dental Supply, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 8/12/2020. (ACC)
August 12, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Notice of Appearance due by 8/28/2020 per Order #4 . (MMS)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: All parties appearing pro hac vice must follow the procedures set forth in Local Rule 83.1(d), by August 28, 2020, in order to properly appear before this Court. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 8/12/2020. (Copy of order mailed to counsel Joshua Reed) (MMS)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer M. Christy S. McCann appearing for Defendants Patterson Companies, Inc., Patterson Dental Supply, Inc. Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (McCann, M. Christy)
August 6, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number MTX400014734 (MMS)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Patterson Companies, Inc., Patterson Dental Supply, Inc.. (McCann, M. Christy)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Patterson Companies, Inc., Patterson Dental Supply, Inc. from Montana Second Judicial District Court, Butte Silver Bow County, case number DV-20-221. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Affidavit of Services, #4 Affidavit of Services) (MMS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeProwse et al v. Patterson Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patterson Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Leo S. Ward
Represented By: M. Christy S. McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patterson Dental Company
Represented By: Leo S. Ward
Represented By: M. Christy S. McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whip-Mix Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Sorenson Brotten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patterson Dental Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Leo S. Ward
Represented By: M. Christy S. McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gia M. LeProwse
Represented By: Ethan A. Welder
Represented By: John F. Lacey
Represented By: Joshua Owen Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul LeProwse
Represented By: Ethan A. Welder
Represented By: John F. Lacey
Represented By: Joshua Owen Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?