Renner v. Polish et al
Plaintiff: John Renner
Defendant: Michael Polish, Bring on the Dancing Horses, LLC and Make Pictures, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00030
Filed: April 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Filing 19 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to Pro Hac Vice Counsel Byron R. Lau re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Lau. (SLR)
June 2, 2021 Filing 18 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to Pro Hac Vice Counsel Marcus Spiegel re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Spiegel. (SLR)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Byron R. Lau. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS AND DEADLINE. Copy of Order mailed to Counsel Lau. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/21/2021. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/2/2021. (SLR)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Marcus Spiegel. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS AND DEADLINE. Copy of Order mailed to Counsel Spiegel. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/21/2021. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/2/2021. (SLR)
June 2, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #13 MOTION Byron R. Lau to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2673823.) by John Renner. (Procter, Veronica)
June 2, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #12 MOTION Marcus Spiegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2673818.) by John Renner. (Procter, Veronica)
May 28, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION Byron R. Lau to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2673823.) Veronica A. Procter appearing for Plaintiff John Renner (Attachments: #1 Sworn Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Procter, Veronica)
May 28, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION Marcus Spiegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2673818.) Veronica A. Procter appearing for Plaintiff John Renner (Attachments: #1 Sworn Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Procter, Veronica)
May 17, 2021 Remark: Counsel David Jonelis is now a registered CM/ECF electronic user. (ACC)
May 14, 2021 Filing 11 STATEMENT re #9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Acknowledgment of Admission by Bring on the Dancing Horses, LLC, Make Pictures, LLC, Michael Polish. (McKeon, Matthew)
May 14, 2021 Filing 10 Letter Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel David Jonelis re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Jonelis. (MMS)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney David Jonelis. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/14/2021. (MMS)
May 13, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION David B. Jonelis to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2664391.) Matthew Anthony McKeon appearing for Defendants Bring on the Dancing Horses, LLC, Make Pictures, LLC, Michael Polish (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (McKeon, Matthew)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/9/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 6/9/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 6/9/2021. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 6/16/2021 at 03:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/3/2021. (ACC)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Honorable Brian Morris. The referral is TERMINATED and the Honorable Magistrate Judge John Johnston no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/3/2021. (ACC)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Michael Polish. (McKeon, Matthew)
April 8, 2021 Filing 4 Mailing of Consent - Honorable John Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Matthew Anthony McKeon, Veronica A. Procter.Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 4/26/2021. (ACC)
April 8, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT (State Court) and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants, filed by John Renner. (ACC)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Montana Second Judicial District Court, Butte-Silver Bow County consisting of: (Attachments: #1 Order of Admission of Pro Hac Vice, #2 Notice of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit - A - Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Transmittal Letter) (ACC)
April 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Montana Second Judicial District Court, Butte-Silver Bow County, case number DV-21-66. (Attachments: #1 A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)
April 7, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0977-2646437 (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renner v. Polish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Polish
Represented By: Matthew Anthony McKeon
Represented By: David B. Jonelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bring on the Dancing Horses, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Anthony McKeon
Represented By: David B. Jonelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Make Pictures, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Anthony McKeon
Represented By: David B. Jonelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Renner
Represented By: Veronica Alyn Proctor
Represented By: Veronica A. Procter
Represented By: Marcus Spiegel
Represented By: Byron R. Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?