Farmhouse Partners Limited Partnership v. Multi-Housing Tax Credit Partners XXX
Plaintiff: Farmhouse Partners Limited Partnership
Defendant: Multi-Housing Tax Credit Partners XXX
Case Number: 2:2021cv00048
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Black on behalf of Farmhouse Partners Limited Partnership (Black, Michael)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Contract Court Reporter is Needed: Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 8/16/2021. Discovery closes 12/17/2021. All pretrial motions, other than discovery motions, shall be filed and fully briefed on or before 2/15/2022. Proposed Final Pretrial Order due by 4/18/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Butte, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Bench Trial set for 5/31/2022 at 09:00 AM in Butte, MT before Judge Brian Morris. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS AND ALL DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/8/2021. (SLR)
July 8, 2021 Filing 18 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Brian Morris: Telephonic Pretrial Conference held on 7/8/2021. (Law Clerk: J. Pollack), (SLL)
July 1, 2021 Filing 17 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Farmhouse Partners Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ltr Quigley to Farmhouse (Feb 10, 2021), #2 Exhibit 2 - Limited Partnership Agreement, Article VIII, #3 Exhibit 3 - Ltr Quigley to Amsden (May 23, 2017), #4 Exhibit 4 - Ltr Dabney to Sussman (undated), #5 Exhibit 5 - Memo Strain to Dabney (Jan 14, 2021), #6 Exhibit 6 - Stipulation (Oct 5, 2016)) (Amsden, John)
July 1, 2021 Filing 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Multi-Housing Tax Credit Partners XXX. (Moses, Cathy)
July 1, 2021 Filing 15 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Farmhouse Partners Limited Partnership. (Amsden, John)
July 1, 2021 Filing 14 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Farmhouse Partners Limited Partnership. (Amsden, John)
June 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Multi-Housing Tax Credit Partners XXX re #6 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Notice of Acceptance and Acknowledgement By Edward F. Quigley] (Quigley, Edward)
June 2, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Multi-Housing Tax Credit Partners XXX re #6 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Notice of Acceptance and Acknowledgement By Cathy T. Moses] (Moses, Cathy)
June 1, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #10 Complaint by Multi-Housing Tax Credit Partners XXX. (Wagner, David)
June 1, 2021 Filing 10 COMPLAINT FOR EQUITABLE RELIEF (STATE COURT) against Multi-Housing Tax Credit Partners XXX, filed by Farmhouse Partners Limited Partnership. (MMS)
June 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Transfer Receipt) (MMS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2021: #3 Certificate of Service) (MMS).
June 1, 2021 Remark: Counsel Edward Quigley and Counsel Cathy Moses is now a registered CM/ECF electronic user. (ACC)
May 25, 2021 Filing 8 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel Cathy T. Moses re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Moses (TLO)
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel Edward F. Quigley re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Quigley (TLO)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edward F. Quigley and Cathy T. Moses for Multi-Housing Tax Credit Partners XXX. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/9/2021. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/25/2021. (TLO)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 7/1/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 7/1/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 7/1/2021. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 7/8/2021 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS, DEADLINES, AND CALL-IN INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/25/2021. (SLR)
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION Edward F. Quigley and Cathy T. Moses to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2670164.) (2nd Filing fee of $262 paid, receipt number MTX400015324) David M. Wagner appearing for Defendant Multi-Housing Tax Credit Partners XXX (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Edward F. Quigley, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Cathy T. Moses) (Wagner, David) Modified on 5/25/2021 to reflect 2nd PHV fee paid receipt MTX400015324(TLO). Modified on 5/25/2021 to add receipt number (MMS).
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Multi-Housing Tax Credit Partners XXX. (Wagner, David)
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal by Multi-Housing Tax Credit Partners XXX. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit CSC Notice of Service of Process, #3 Exhibit Exercise of GP Option, #4 Exhibit Appraisal Report) (Wagner, David)
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendants from Montana 18th Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, case number DV-21-450 B. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (TLO)
May 25, 2021 Filing fee: $402, receipt number 0977-2669918 (TLO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmhouse Partners Limited Partnership v. Multi-Housing Tax Credit Partners XXX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmhouse Partners Limited Partnership
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Trent M. Gardner
Represented By: Michael G. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multi-Housing Tax Credit Partners XXX
Represented By: Edward F. Quigley
Represented By: Cathy T. Moses
Represented By: David M. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?