Haskett et al v. American Home Centers et al
Plaintiff: Howard J. Haskett and Kathleen M. Haskett
Defendant: American Home Centers, Kit Homebuilders West, Bennett Truck Transport and John Does 2-5
Case Number: 2:2021cv00068
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2022 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Jury Trial set for 12/13/2022 at 09:00 AM in Butte, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Amended Pleadings due by 12/17/2021. Discovery due by 6/17/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 12/17/2021. Motions due by 8/16/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/17/2022. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/14/2021. (TLO)
October 14, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Correction: re 16 Disclosure Statement. The filing error relates to: Discovery. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (SLR)
October 14, 2021 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement by Bennett Truck Transport. (Smith, Charles)
October 14, 2021 Filing 15 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Bennett Truck Transport. (Smith, Charles)
October 12, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Howard J. Haskett, Kathleen M. Haskett. Amendment to #13 Statement of Stipulated Facts . (Palmer, Rex) Modified on 10/12/2021 to clean up text. (SLR).
October 8, 2021 Filing 13 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Howard J. Haskett, Kathleen M. Haskett. (Palmer, Rex)
October 8, 2021 Remark: With regard to the Certificate of Service contained in #12 Preliminary Pretrial Statement, Counsel is reminded that pursuant to L.R. 11.1.(d), "Only a judge, a registered user, the clerk of court, a court reporter, or deputy clerks of court may use the /s/ signature form, and, except as provided by L.R. 11.2(a)(1), only when signing the document as the filer and filing electronically. All other signatures, including those on any affidavit, must be hand signatures". This is for future reference; the document does NOT need to be refiled. Thank you. (SLR)
October 7, 2021 Filing 12 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Howard J. Haskett, Kathleen M. Haskett. (Palmer, Rex)
October 6, 2021 Filing 11 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Kit Homebuilders West. (Haus, Matthew)
October 6, 2021 Filing 10 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by American Home Centers. (Beaudette, Jesse)
October 6, 2021 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by American Home Centers. (Beaudette, Jesse)
September 14, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by American Home Centers. (Beaudette, Jesse)
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Kit Homebuilders West. (Haus, Matthew)
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND (State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Kathleen M. Haskett, Howard J. Haskett. (SLR)
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND (State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Kathleen M. Haskett, Howard J. Haskett. (SLR)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Montana Second Judicial District Court, Silver Bow County, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket, #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Defendant's Motion for Change of Venue and Brief in Support, #4 Plaintiffs' Response to Motion for Change of Venue, #5 Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Change of Venue, #6 Notice of Appearance, #7 Notice of Submittal) (SLR)
September 8, 2021 Remark: State Court documents were received electronically. The Clerk's Office for Federal Court is not in possession of the hard copy original documents. (SLR)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/6/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/6/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/6/2021. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS, ALL DEADLINES, AND CALL-IN INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/7/2021. (SLR)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Bennett Truck Transport. (Smith, Charles)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bennett Truck Transport from Montana Second Judicial District Court, Silver Bow County, case number DV-20-208. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (SLR)
September 7, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 0977-2722524. (SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haskett et al v. American Home Centers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard J. Haskett
Represented By: Lincoln Palmer
Represented By: Rex L. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen M. Haskett
Represented By: Lincoln Palmer
Represented By: Rex L. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Centers
Represented By: Matthew Albert Haus
Represented By: Jesse Beaudette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kit Homebuilders West
Represented By: Matthew Albert Haus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennett Truck Transport
Represented By: Charles K. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 2-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?