Alliance for the Wild Rockies et al v. Haaland et al
Plaintiff: Alliance for the Wild Rockies and Native Ecosystems Council
Defendant: Deb Haaland, Tracy Stone-Manning, Sonya Germann, Lindsey Babcock and Unnamed Authorized Officer
Case Number: 2:2022cv00062
Filed: September 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2022 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Native Ecosystems Council. (Martin, Samuel)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.; granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.Each applicant shall file, within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order, an acknowledgment and acceptance of their admission under the terms set forth above. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/1/2022. (ACC)
October 25, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION Brian Ertz to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-2938990.) Samuel Loveridge Martin, III appearing for Plaintiff Alliance for the Wild Rockies (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for B Ertz, #2 Order to be emailed) (Martin, Samuel)
October 25, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION Jessica Christy to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-2939006.) Samuel Loveridge Martin, III appearing for Plaintiff Native Ecosystems Council (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for J Christy, #2 Proposed Order) (Martin, Samuel)
September 19, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Haaland (Attachments: #1 Stone-Manning Summons, #2 Germann Summons, #3 Babcock Summons, #4 Unnamed Authorized Officer Summons, #5 AUSA Laslovich Summons) Counsel may download and print summonses for service. (HEG)
September 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Native Ecosystems Council. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG)
September 19, 2022 Filing fee received: $ 402, receipt number AMTDC-2938155 (HEG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alliance for the Wild Rockies et al v. Haaland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alliance for the Wild Rockies
Represented By: Samuel Loveridge Martin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Native Ecosystems Council
Represented By: Samuel Loveridge Martin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb Haaland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Stone-Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Germann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unnamed Authorized Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?