Buday et al v. Bear's Home Renovation and Repairs
Plaintiff: Mitchell Buday, Ryan Buday and Shara Buday
Defendant: Bear's Home Renovation and Repairs and Bary Waddell
Case Number: 2:2022cv00063
Filed: September 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER RESETTING: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Pretrial Conference is reset for 1/12/2023 at 09:00 AM in Butte, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/21/2022. (SLL)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER Re-Setting Hearing on Motion #10 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion Hearing is reset for 1/12/2023 at 09:00 AM in Butte, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/21/2022. (SLL)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER; Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 12/28/2022, Joint Discovery Plan due by 12/28/2022, Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 12/28/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2023 at 09:00 AM in Butte, MT before Judge Brian Morris. The Court will also conduct a hearing on Defendants Motion to Dismiss #10 on January 11, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/14/2022. (TLO)
November 14, 2022 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bear's Home Renovation and Repairs. (Henke, Lawrence)
November 14, 2022 Filing 11 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #10 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Bary Waddell. (Henke, Lawrence)
November 14, 2022 Filing 10 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Lawrence E. Henke appearing for Defendant Bary Waddell (Henke, Lawrence)
November 14, 2022 Filing 9 First ANSWER to #1 Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Bear's Home Renovation and Repairs. (Henke, Lawrence)
October 25, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Bary Waddell on 10/24/2022, filed by Mitchell Buday, Shara Buday. (Peterson, Scott)
October 25, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Bear's Home Renovation and Repairs, LLC on 10/24/2022, filed by Mitchell Buday, Shara Buday. (Peterson, Scott)
October 25, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Bear's Home Renovation and Repairs answer due 11/14/2022; Bary Waddell answer due 11/14/2022. (MMS)
October 24, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED Summonses Issued as to Bear's Home Renovation and Repairs, Bary Waddell. (Attachments: #1 Issued Amended Summons - Waddell) (ACC) Counsel is directed to download and print the summonses for service
October 21, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Mitchell Buday, Shara Buday. Amended Summonses. (Attachments: #1 Amended Summons Waddell) (Peterson, Scott)
September 30, 2022 Filing 4 Summonses Issued as to Bear's Home Renovation and Repairs, Bary Waddell. (Attachments: #1 Issued Summons - Waddell) Counsel is directed to download and print the summons for service (ACC)
September 30, 2022 Filing 3 Submission of Proposed Summons as to Bary Waddell, re #1 Complaint (Peterson, Scott)
September 30, 2022 Filing 2 Submission of Proposed Summons as to Bear's Home Renovation and Repairs, re #1 Complaint (Peterson, Scott)
September 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bear's Home Renovation and Repairs, filed by Shara Buday, Mitchell Buday. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG)
September 26, 2022 Filing fee received: $ 402, receipt number BMTDC-2939811 (HEG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buday et al v. Bear's Home Renovation and Repairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Buday
Represented By: Scott L. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Buday
Represented By: Scott L. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shara Buday
Represented By: Scott L. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bear's Home Renovation and Repairs
Represented By: Lawrence E. Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bary Waddell
Represented By: Lawrence E. Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?