THE IMPERIAL SOVEREIGN COURT OF THE STATE OF MONTANA et al v. Knudsen et al
Plaintiff: THE IMPERIAL SOVEREIGN COURT OF THE STATE OF MONTANA, ADRIA JAWORT, RACHEL CORCORAN, MONTANA BOOK COMPANY, IMAGINE BREWING COMPANY, LLC doing business as IMAGINE NATION BREWING COMPANY, BUMBLEBEE AERIAL FITNESS, THE WESTERN MONTANA COMMUNITY CENTER, THE GREAT FALLS LGBTQ+ CENTER, THE MYRNA LOY, Montana Pride and The Roxy Theater
Defendant: Austin Knudsen, Elsie Arntzen, J.P. Gallagher and The City of Helena
Case Number: 2:2023cv00050
Filed: July 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 IT IS ORDERED:Parties shall submit simultaneous briefing in support of Defendants Knudsens, Arntzens, and Gallaghers right to jury trial, in 42 U.S.C. 1983 litigation and litigation arising from the First and Fifth Amendment of the U.S. Constitution as incorporated by the Fourteenth Amendment, on or before September 11, 2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/4/2023. (SLL)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Brian Morris: Motion Hearing held on 8/28/2023 re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MONTANA BOOK COMPANY, RACHEL CORCORAN, THE IMPERIAL SOVEREIGN COURT OF THE STATE OF MONTANA, THE WESTERN MONTANA COMMUNITY CENTER, BUMBLEBEE AERIAL FITNESS, ADRIA JAWORT, THE GREAT FALLS LGBTQ+ CENTER, THE MYRNA LOY, IMAGINE BREWING COMPANY, LLC. Present in the courtroom for the Plaintiffs are Constance Van Kley, Niki Zupanic and Rylee Summers-Flanagan, Michael Russel for State of Montana Defendants Austin Knudsen and Elise Arntzen, Rebecca Dockter for Defendant City of Helena and Cynthia Walker for Defendant J.P. Gallagher. Parties are advised of the purpose of todays hearing. Arguments are heard by Van Kley and Russell. Counsel Dockter and Walker heard briefly only as to their positions regarding the defendants they represent and state they are not part of the preliminary injunction relief being sought. The matter is deemed submitted. The Court will review the jury demand and get back to the parties as to the next step. Recess. Hearing commenced at 2:32 and concluded at 3:48. (Court Reporter Yvette Heinze.) (Law Clerk: T. Devine), (Hearing held in Helena) (HEG)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BUMBLEBEE AERIAL FITNESS, RACHEL CORCORAN, IMAGINE BREWING COMPANY, LLC, ADRIA JAWORT, MONTANA BOOK COMPANY, Montana Pride, THE GREAT FALLS LGBTQ+ CENTER, THE IMPERIAL SOVEREIGN COURT OF THE STATE OF MONTANA, THE MYRNA LOY, THE WESTERN MONTANA COMMUNITY CENTER, The Roxy Theater. (Zupanic, Niki)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by IMAGINE BREWING COMPANY, LLC, ADRIA JAWORT, MONTANA BOOK COMPANY, Montana Pride, THE GREAT FALLS LGBTQ+ CENTER, THE IMPERIAL SOVEREIGN COURT OF THE STATE OF MONTANA, THE MYRNA LOY, THE WESTERN MONTANA COMMUNITY CENTER, The Roxy Theater. (Van Kley, Constance)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Terminate Deadlines as to #4 Response ddl; hearing has been set. (ACC)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint, by The City of Helena. (Dockter, Rebecca)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 State Defendants' ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Elsie Arntzen, Austin Knudsen. (Lansing, Alwyn) Modified on 8/10/2023 to add link(ACC).
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint, by J.P. Gallagher. (Walker, Cynthia)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #18 Response to Motion for Peliminary Injunction by J.P. Gallagher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Legal Notice and Litigation Hold Letter) (Walker, Cynthia)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #18 Response to Motion for Peliminary Injunction by J.P. Gallagher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Twitter Post, #2 Exhibit B. Social Media Group Chat, #3 Exhibit C. Letter to Ms. Jawort) (Walker, Cynthia)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by J.P. Gallagher. (Walker, Cynthia)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Elsie Arntzen, Austin Knudsen. (Russell, Michael)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #15 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. State Defendants' Response is now due August 2, 2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/31/2023. (MMS)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Michael Russell appearing for Defendants Elsie Arntzen, Austin Knudsen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Russell, Michael)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Michael Russell appearing for Defendants Elsie Arntzen, Austin Knudsen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Russell, Michael)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2023 at 02:30 PM in Helena, MT before Judge Brian Morris. (MMS)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion #4 is hereby GRANTED, in part, and DEFERRED, in part. The Court will GRANT Plaintiffs' request for a TRO only. Defendants Knudsen and Arntzen are hereby ENJOINED from enforcing H.B. 359 pending the Court's determination of Plaintiff's entitlement to a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/28/2023. (MMS)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Brian Morris: Motion Hearing held on 7/26/2023 re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MONTANA BOOK COMPANY, RACHEL CORCORAN, THE IMPERIAL SOVEREIGN COURT OF THE STATE OF MONTANA, THE WESTERN MONTANA COMMUNITY CENTER, BUMBLEBEE AERIAL FITNESS, ADRIA JAWORT, THE GREAT FALLS LGBTQ+ CENTER, THE MYRNA LOY, IMAGINE BREWING COMPANY, LLC. Present in the courtroom for the Plaintiffs are Constance Van Kley, Niki Zupanic and Rylee Summers-Flanagan; Thane Johnson and Michael Russel for Defendants Austin Knudsen and Elise Arntzen; Rebecca Dockter for Defendant City of Helena and Cynthia Walker for Defendant J.P. Gallagher. Arguments are heard by Van Kley, Johnson and Dockter. The TRO matter is deemed submitted and an order will be issued as soon as possible. The parties are to file their responses and replies to the motion for preliminary injunction. The Court will hear arguments on the motion on August 28th at 2:30 pm in Helena. Court is in Recess. Hearing commenced at 2:01 and concluded at 3:52, ( Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2023 at 02:30 PM in Helena, MT before Judge Brian Morris.). (Court Reporter Kim Marchwick.) (Law Clerk: E. Hodges and L. Love), (Hearing held in Helena) (HEG)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia L. Walker on behalf of J.P. Gallagher (Walker, Cynthia)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by The City of Helena. (Dockter, Rebecca)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Dockter on behalf of The City of Helena (Dockter, Rebecca)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE by BUMBLEBEE AERIAL FITNESS, RACHEL CORCORAN, IMAGINE BREWING COMPANY, LLC, ADRIA JAWORT, MONTANA BOOK COMPANY, Montana Pride, THE GREAT FALLS LGBTQ+ CENTER, THE IMPERIAL SOVEREIGN COURT OF THE STATE OF MONTANA, THE MYRNA LOY, THE WESTERN MONTANA COMMUNITY CENTER, The Roxy Theater re #7 Order Setting (Van Kley, Constance)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting: Hearing set for 7/26/2023 at 02:00 PM in Helena, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/19/2023. (KAH) Modified on 7/19/2023 Kim Marchwick to report (HEG).
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The City of Helena. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (ACC)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BUMBLEBEE AERIAL FITNESS, RACHEL CORCORAN, IMAGINE BREWING COMPANY, LLC, ADRIA JAWORT, MONTANA BOOK COMPANY, THE GREAT FALLS LGBTQ+ CENTER, THE IMPERIAL SOVEREIGN COURT OF THE STATE OF MONTANA, THE MYRNA LOY, THE WESTERN MONTANA COMMUNITY CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, HB 359, #2 Exhibit 2, Jawort Decl., #3 Exhibit 3, Smith Decl., #4 Exhibit 4, Malecek Decl., #5 Exhibit 5, Steinberg Decl., #6 Exhibit 6, Holmes Decl., #7 Exhibit 7, Rice Decl., #8 Exhibit 8, Halverson Decl., #9 Exhibit 9, Hamm Decl., #10 Exhibit 10, Corcoran Decl.) (Van Kley, Constance)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Constance Van Kley appearing for Plaintiffs BUMBLEBEE AERIAL FITNESS, RACHEL CORCORAN, IMAGINE BREWING COMPANY, LLC, ADRIA JAWORT, MONTANA BOOK COMPANY, THE GREAT FALLS LGBTQ+ CENTER, THE IMPERIAL SOVEREIGN COURT OF THE STATE OF MONTANA, THE MYRNA LOY, THE WESTERN MONTANA COMMUNITY CENTER. (Van Kley, Constance) Modified on 7/31/2023 (MMS).
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by THE WESTERN MONTANA COMMUNITY CENTER, RACHEL CORCORAN, IMAGINE BREWING COMPANY, LLC, BUMBLEBEE AERIAL FITNESS, THE IMPERIAL SOVEREIGN COURT OF THE STATE OF MONTANA, THE MYRNA LOY, THE GREAT FALLS LGBTQ+ CENTER, MONTANA BOOK COMPANY, ADRIA JAWORT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - HB 359, #2 Summons: City of Helena) (Van Kley, Constance)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Elsie Arntzen, J.P. Gallagher, Austin Knudsen. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued Knudsen, #2 Summons Issued Gallagher) (TLO)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by THE WESTERN MONTANA COMMUNITY CENTER, RACHEL CORCORAN, IMAGINE BREWING COMPANY, LLC, BUMBLEBEE AERIAL FITNESS, THE IMPERIAL SOVEREIGN COURT OF THE STATE OF MONTANA, THE MYRNA LOY, THE GREAT FALLS LGBTQ+ CENTER, MONTANA BOOK COMPANY, ADRIA JAWORT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Knudsen Summons, #3 Arntzen Summons, #4 Gallagher Summons) (TLO)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $402, receipt number AMTDC-3094973 (TLO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE IMPERIAL SOVEREIGN COURT OF THE STATE OF MONTANA et al v. Knudsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE IMPERIAL SOVEREIGN COURT OF THE STATE OF MONTANA
Represented By: Constance Van Kley
Represented By: Niki Zupanic
Represented By: Rylee K. Sommers-Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADRIA JAWORT
Represented By: Constance Van Kley
Represented By: Niki Zupanic
Represented By: Rylee K. Sommers-Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHEL CORCORAN
Represented By: Constance Van Kley
Represented By: Niki Zupanic
Represented By: Rylee K. Sommers-Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTANA BOOK COMPANY
Represented By: Niki Zupanic
Represented By: Constance Van Kley
Represented By: Rylee K. Sommers-Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IMAGINE BREWING COMPANY, LLC doing business as IMAGINE NATION BREWING COMPANY
Represented By: Constance Van Kley
Represented By: Niki Zupanic
Represented By: Rylee K. Sommers-Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BUMBLEBEE AERIAL FITNESS
Represented By: Constance Van Kley
Represented By: Niki Zupanic
Represented By: Rylee K. Sommers-Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE WESTERN MONTANA COMMUNITY CENTER
Represented By: Constance Van Kley
Represented By: Niki Zupanic
Represented By: Rylee K. Sommers-Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE GREAT FALLS LGBTQ+ CENTER
Represented By: Niki Zupanic
Represented By: Rylee K. Sommers-Flanagan
Represented By: Constance Van Kley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE MYRNA LOY
Represented By: Niki Zupanic
Represented By: Rylee K. Sommers-Flanagan
Represented By: Constance Van Kley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana Pride
Represented By: Constance Van Kley
Represented By: Niki Zupanic
Represented By: Rylee K. Sommers-Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Roxy Theater
Represented By: Constance Van Kley
Represented By: Niki Zupanic
Represented By: Rylee K. Sommers-Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Knudsen
Represented By: Alwyn Lansing
Represented By: Emily E. Jones
Represented By: Michael Noonan
Represented By: Michael Russell
Represented By: Thane P. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsie Arntzen
Represented By: Michael Noonan
Represented By: Michael Russell
Represented By: Thane P. Johnson
Represented By: Alwyn Lansing
Represented By: Emily E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Gallagher
Represented By: Cynthia L. Walker
Represented By: Shelby K. Towe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Helena
Represented By: Rebecca Dockter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?