Talbot v. Ainuu et al
Plaintiff: Johnathan Talbot
Defendant: Manoah Ainuu and The North Face Apparel Corp.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00066
Filed: October 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Johnathan Talbot re #20 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,, Ian Prior (Monforton, Matthew)
November 30, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Johnathan Talbot re #20 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,, Nicholas Barry (Monforton, Matthew)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicholas Barry. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.; granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ian Prior. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 12/12/2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/27/2023. (ACC)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Upon the Unopposed #18 Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, and with good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline by which Defendant Manoah Ainuu must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended until December 19, 2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/27/2023. (ACC)
November 27, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Peter M. Meloy appearing for Defendant Manoah Ainuu. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Meloy, Peter)
November 27, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Meloy on behalf of Manoah Ainuu (Meloy, Peter)
November 21, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION Ian Prior to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number BMTDC-3163991.). Matthew G. Monforton appearing for Plaintiff Johnathan Talbot. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of PHV Mtn) (Monforton, Matthew)
November 21, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION Nicholas Barry to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3163972.). Matthew G. Monforton appearing for Plaintiff Johnathan Talbot. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of PHV Mtn) (Monforton, Matthew)
November 9, 2023 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The North Face Apparel Corp. identifying Corporate Parent V.F. Corporation, Corporate Parent VF Outdoor, LLC for The North Face Apparel Corp... (Salomao Nascimento, Isabella)
November 9, 2023 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proof of Service. Served on Manoah Ainuu on 11/07/2023, filed by Johnathan Talbot. Manoah Ainuu answer due date 11/28/2023. (Monforton, Matthew)
November 3, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by The North Face Apparel Corp. re #9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,,,,,, (Salomao Nascimento, Isabella)
November 3, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by The North Face Apparel Corp. re #9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,,,,,, (Walker, Leita)
November 3, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by The North Face Apparel Corp. re #9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,,,,,, (Berlin, Seth)
November 3, 2023 Terminate Deadlines as to #9 Pro Hac ddl; acknowledgments filed 11/2/23. (ACC)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney (Seth Berlin) NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney (Leita Walker) NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney (Isabella Naciamento) NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 11/15/2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/31/2023. (MMS)
October 31, 2023 Filing 8 Submission of Proposed Order re: #6 First MOTION Leita Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3152300.), #7 First MOTION Isabella Naciamento to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3152314.), #5 First MOTION Seth Berlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3152246.). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Meloy, Peter)
October 31, 2023 Filing 7 First MOTION Isabella Naciamento to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3152314.). Peter M. Meloy appearing for Defendant The North Face Apparel Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Meloy, Peter)
October 31, 2023 Filing 6 First MOTION Leita Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3152300.). Peter M. Meloy appearing for Defendant The North Face Apparel Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Meloy, Peter)
October 31, 2023 Filing 5 First MOTION Seth Berlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3152246.). Peter M. Meloy appearing for Defendant The North Face Apparel Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Meloy, Peter)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer The North Face Apparel Corp. answer due 12/19/2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/30/2023. (MMS)
October 28, 2023 Filing 3 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Peter M. Meloy appearing for Defendant The North Face Apparel Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Meloy, Peter) Modified on 10/30/2023 to add unopposed(ACC).
October 2, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (SAJ)
October 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Manoah Ainuu, The North Face Apparel Corp., filed by Johnathan Talbot. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit VF Corp Form-10K, #4 Exhibit Novak Decl, #5 Exhibit Ainuu Instagram Profile, #6 Exhibit North Face Press Release, #7 Exhibit Ainuu Stolen Land Post, #8 Exhibit Talbot Decl, #9 Exhibit Ainuu June 21 Post, #10 Exhibit Burelson Linkedin, #11 Exhibit Republications, #12 Exhibit Outdoor Research Instagram, #13 Exhibit Ainuu June 23 Instagram Post, #14 Exhibit Ainuu July 4 Posts) (SAJ)
October 2, 2023 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMTDC-3136790 (SAJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talbot v. Ainuu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathan Talbot
Represented By: Matthew G. Monforton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manoah Ainuu
Represented By: Peter M. Meloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The North Face Apparel Corp.
Represented By: Isabella Salomao Nascimento
Represented By: Leita Walker
Represented By: Peter M. Meloy
Represented By: Seth D Berlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?