Rangitsch v. Travelers Indemnity Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kevin Rangitsch
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv00078
Filed: November 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2023 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Indemnity Insurance Company. (Wilson, Jon)
December 20, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Travelers Indemnity Insurance Company. (Wilson, Jon)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 1/17/2024. Joint Discovery Plan due by 1/17/2024. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 1/17/2024. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2024 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 12/11/2023. (ACC)
December 11, 2023 Filing 9 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ Pursuant to L.R. 73.1 and consent of the parties having been made, this case is assigned to the United States magistrate judge to conduct all further proceedings, enter judgment and conduct all post-trial proceedings. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John Johnston. (SAJ)
December 11, 2023 Filing 8 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge form.
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Travelers Indemnity Insurance Company answer due 12/22/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 12/6/2023. (ACC)
December 6, 2023 Filing 6 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge form.
December 6, 2023 Filing 5 Service of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge form. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 12/20/2023. (SAJ)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and NOTICE of Appearance by Jon A. Wilson on behalf of Travelers Indemnity Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Wilson, Jon) Modified on 11/28/2023 to change to a motion(ACC).
November 15, 2023 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint. Served on Cindy Lease on 11/15/2023, filed by Kevin Rangitsch. Travelers Indemnity Insurance Company answer due date 12/6/2023. (McKeon, Michael)
November 8, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Travelers Indemnity Insurance Company. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (SAJ)
November 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Travelers Indemnity Insurance Company, filed by Kevin Rangitsch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (SAJ)
November 8, 2023 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMTDC-3157377 (SAJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rangitsch v. Travelers Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Rangitsch
Represented By: Michael McKeon, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael P. Sarabia
Represented By: Jon A. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?