Thompson v. US Bank et al
Plaintiff: Peter Thompson
Defendant: US Bank, Andy Cecere, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., Jason Henderson, Halliday, Watkins & Mann, P.C., Benjamin J. Mann, Auction.com LLC, Jason Allnut, Ali Haralson and George Lane
Case Number: 2:2023cv00080
Filed: November 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2024 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Auction.com LLC identifying Corporate Parent Auction.com Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent THL Equity Fund VII Investors (Decade), L.P. for Auction.com LLC.. (McClendon, Regina)
January 9, 2024 Filing 27 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Auction.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice) (McClendon, Regina)
January 9, 2024 Filing 26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Regina J. McClendon appearing for Defendant Auction.com LLC. (McClendon, Regina)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT Order Vacating: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the January 22, 2024 motion hearing is VACATED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/9/2024. (SLL)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 IT IS ORDERED: Thompsons First Pro Se Motion for Extension is GRANTED. Thompson shall have until February 15, 2024, to file an amended complaint in this action or to file answers to U.S. Banks motion to dismiss (Doc. 14.) and Halliday, Watkins & Manns motion to dismiss. (Doc. 17.) Defendants may file renewed motions to dismiss should Thompson file an amended complaint. The Court stays consideration of U.S. Banks motion to dismiss (Doc. 14). Should Thompson fail to file an amended complaint by the Courts deadline, the Court will consider U.S. Banks motion to dismiss. The Court stays consideration of Halliday, Watkins & Manns motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim. (Doc. 17.) Should Thompson fail to file an amended complaint by the Courts deadline, the Court will consider Halliday, Watkins & Manns motion to dismiss. Thompsons motion for a preliminary injunction and temporary restraining order (Doc. 8) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/9/2024. (KAH)
January 9, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Thompson shall have until February 15, 2024, to file an amended complaint in this action or to file answers to U.S. Banks motion to dismiss (Doc. 14.) and Halliday, Watkins & Manns motion to dismiss. (Doc. 17.) Responses due by 2/15/2024. (KAH)
January 8, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE by Andy Cecere, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., US Bank re 13 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, Defendants' Notice of Intent to Attend Hearing by Zoom (McClendon, Regina) Modified on 1/8/2024 to reflect (Zoom Link emailed to Counsel McClendon) (SAJ).
January 4, 2024 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 First Pro Se Motion for Extension by Peter Thompson. filed by Jason Henderson. (Henderson, Jason)
January 4, 2024 Response deadline of 12/12/23 as to #8 terminated; response deadline of 12/22/23 as to #14 terminated; response deadline of 12/25/2023 as to #17 terminated. Motions #14 and #17 are now ripe, emailed chambers (TLO)
December 29, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 First Pro Se Motion for Extension by Peter Thompson. Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to File a Response or Amend Complaint filed by Andy Cecere, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., US Bank. (McClendon, Regina)
December 22, 2023 Filing 20 First Pro Se Motion for Extension by Peter Thompson. (Thompson, Peter)
December 19, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order U.S. Bank National Association's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by US Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trustee's Deed) (McClendon, Regina)
December 4, 2023 Filing 18 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Halliday, Watkins & Mann, P.C.. (Henderson, Jason)
December 4, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Jason Henderson appearing for Defendant Halliday, Watkins & Mann, P.C.. (Henderson, Jason)
December 4, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Henderson on behalf of Halliday, Watkins & Mann, P.C. (Henderson, Jason)
December 1, 2023 Filing 15 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Andy Cecere, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., US Bank. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice) (McClendon, Regina)
December 1, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Regina J. McClendon appearing for Defendants Andy Cecere, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., US Bank. (McClendon, Regina)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #12 Supplemental Pro Se Motion by Peter Thompson : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Motion Hearing is set for 1/22/2024 at 02:30 PM in Helena, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Out of State Counsel may appear by Zoom by filing a notice with the Court. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/30/2023. (SLL)
November 30, 2023 Filing 12 Supplemental Pro Se Motion by Peter Thompson (Thompson, Peter)
November 29, 2023 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order U.S. Bank National Association's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by US Bank. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice) (McClendon, Regina)
November 28, 2023 Filing 10 PRO SE REGISTRATION FORM by Plaintiff Peter Thompson. Reminder: Please request CM/ECF access via PACER. (SGN)
November 28, 2023 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Peter Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Ltr to borrower dated 6-30-23, #3 Exhibit 3 - Attachments in support of TRO and Prelim Injunction) (ACC)
November 28, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Peter Thompson. (ACC)
November 28, 2023 REMARK: E-filing request approved and sent to PACER for Plaintiff Peter Thompson. (SGN)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is REASSIGNED to the Honorable Brian Morris. Signed by Chief Judge Brian Morris on November 27, 2023. (SLL)
November 20, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., US Bank identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for US Bank; Corporate Parent ICE Mortgage Services, LLC, Corporate Parent Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., Corporate Parent MERSCORP Holdings, Inc. for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc... (McClendon, Regina)
November 20, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., US Bank Notice of Related Cases (McClendon, Regina)
November 20, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Regina J. McClendon on behalf of Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., US Bank (McClendon, Regina)
November 20, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Peter Thompson (MMS)
November 15, 2023 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 416635. (KAH)
November 13, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 US Bank Summons, #2 Cecere Summons, #3 Mortgage Summons, #4 Henderson Summons, #5 Halliday Summons, #6 Mann Summons, #7 Auction Summons, #8 Allnut Summons, #9 Haralson Summons) (KAH)
November 13, 2023 Filing 2 PRO SE REGISTRATION FORM by Plaintiff Peter Thompson. (KAH)
November 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Peter Thompson. (KAH)
November 13, 2023 Magistrate Judge John Johnston added. (MMS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. US Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank
Represented By: Regina J. McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Cecere
Represented By: Regina J. McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.
Represented By: Regina J. McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Henderson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Mann
Represented By: Jason Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliday, Watkins & Mann, P.C.
Represented By: Benjamin J. Mann
Represented By: Jason Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin J. Mann
Represented By: Benjamin J. Mann
Represented By: Jason Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auction.com LLC
Represented By: Regina J. McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Allnut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Haralson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?