Oak Place Northeast Bozeman, LLC v. Conti Bozeman, LLC
Plaintiff: Oak Place Northeast Bozeman, LLC
Defendant: Conti Bozeman, LLC and 1302 Conti, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2024cv00006
Filed: January 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Donald W Molloy
2 Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2024 Filing 33 Answer to Counterclaim in ANSWER to #24 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Conti Bozeman, LLC by Oak Place Northeast Bozeman, LLC. (Kauffman, John)
February 26, 2024 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1302 Conti, LLC., Conti Bozeman, LLC. (Westesen, Neil)
February 26, 2024 Filing 31 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Oak Place Northeast Bozeman, LLC. (Kauffman, John)
February 26, 2024 Filing 30 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by 1302 Conti, LLC., Conti Bozeman, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Development Agreement) (Westesen, Neil)
February 26, 2024 Filing 29 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Oak Place Northeast Bozeman, LLC. (Kauffman, John)
February 23, 2024 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oak Place Northeast Bozeman, LLC. (Kauffman, John) (NOS)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. The telephonic pretrial conference set for February 28, 2024, is VACATED. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for March 26, 2024, at 10:30 a.m. in the Russell Smith Courthouse in Missoula, Montana. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 2/21/2024. (NOS)
February 21, 2024 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings. (NOS)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Donald W. Molloy for all further proceedings. Judge Brian Morris no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/20/2024. (MPB)
February 20, 2024 Filing 25 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Oak Place Northeast Bozeman, LLC. (Kauffman, John)
February 12, 2024 Filing 24 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Oak Place Northeast Bozeman, LLC by Conti Bozeman, LLC, 1302 Conti, LLC.. (Westesen, Neil)
January 30, 2024 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Oak Place Northeast Bozeman, LLC. 1302 Conti, LLC. waiver sent on 1/30/2024, answer due 4/1/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Issued) (Kauffman, John)
January 29, 2024 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to 1302 Conti, LLC. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (ACC)
January 29, 2024 Filing 21 Submission of Proposed Summons as to Oak Place Northeast Bozeman, LLC, re #20 Amended Complaint (Kauffman, John)
January 29, 2024 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 1302 Conti, LLC., Conti Bozeman, LLC, filed by Oak Place Northeast Bozeman, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (KAH)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court will file the Amended Complaint, (Doc. 16-1) on the docket. #16 Motion to Amend/Correct Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/29/2024. (KAH)
January 29, 2024 Filing 18 ERRATA re #16 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint, #17 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Oak Place Northeast Bozeman, LLC. (Kauffman, John) Modified on 1/29/2024 to correct title (ACC).
January 29, 2024 Filing 17 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #16 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Oak Place Northeast Bozeman, LLC. (Kauffman, John)
January 29, 2024 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. John M. Kauffman appearing for Plaintiff Oak Place Northeast Bozeman, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Draft Amended Complaint) (Kauffman, John)
January 26, 2024 Filing 15 Notice of Correction: re #14 Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order. The filing error relates to: Signature and Login Do not Match. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (ACC)
January 25, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Conti Bozeman, LLC re #9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,, (Deal, Aditi)
January 25, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Conti Bozeman, LLC re #9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,, (Deal, Aditi)
January 23, 2024 Filing 12 Remark: State Court documents received by Clerk's Office electronically. No originals or hard copies were received. Transfer receipt (attached) returned to Clerk via email. (SAJ)
January 23, 2024 Filing 11 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Conti Bozeman, LLC, filed by Oak Place Northeast Bozeman, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (SAJ)
January 23, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF STATE COURT FILE RECEIVED (from MONTANA EIGHTEENTH JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT, GALLATIN COUNTY, case number DV-16-2023-0001179-BC.) (Attachments: #1 State Court Summons, #2 State Court Acknowledgment of Service, #3 State Court Notice of Filing Removal) (SAJ)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan Pelayo NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.; ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Aditi Deal NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 2/6/2024. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/22/2024. (ACC)
January 19, 2024 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION Aditi Deal to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 273 receipt number AMTDC-3195544.). Neil G. Westesen appearing for Defendant Conti Bozeman, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Deal, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Westesen, Neil)
January 19, 2024 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION Jonathan Pelayo to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 273 receipt number CMTDC-3195532.). Neil G. Westesen appearing for Defendant Conti Bozeman, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Pelayo, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Westesen, Neil)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 2/26/2024. Joint Discovery Plan due by 2/26/2024. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 2/26/2024. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2024 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/18/2024. (see order for full details) (SAJ)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Brian Morris. The referral is TERMINATED and the Honorable Magistrate Judge John Johnston no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/18/2024. (SAJ)
January 18, 2024 Filing 4 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge form.
January 17, 2024 Filing 3 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge form.
January 12, 2024 Filing 2 Service of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge form. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 1/26/2024. (SAJ)
January 12, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Conti Bozeman, LLC from MONTANA EIGHTEENTH JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT, GALLATIN COUNTY, case number DV 23-1179BC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 State Court Summons, #4 State Court Acknowledgement, #5 State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Donnelly Declaration) (SAJ)
January 12, 2024 Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMTDC-3191068 (SAJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oak Place Northeast Bozeman, LLC v. Conti Bozeman, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oak Place Northeast Bozeman, LLC
Represented By: John M. Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conti Bozeman, LLC
Represented By: Neil G. Westesen
Represented By: Aditi Deal
Represented By: Jonathan Pelayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1302 Conti, LLC.
Represented By: Aditi Deal
Represented By: Jonathan Pelayo
Represented By: Neil G. Westesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?