Great Harvest Franchising v. Green et al
Plaintiff: Great Harvest Franchising
Defendant: Gregory Andrew Williams Green and Kimberly Elaine Green
Case Number: 2:2024cv00032
Filed: May 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2024 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Great Harvest Franchising of receipt of Surety Bond #5326044. (ACC)
June 3, 2024 Remark: Surety Bond #5326044 mailed via USPS to Crowley Fleck along with receipt to be signed and returned to GF Clerk's office. (ACC)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #16 Joint MOTION for Order/Judgment and Permanent Restraining Order filed by Great Harvest Franchising. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS** The Clerk is hereby directed to release the surety bond posted by GreatHarvest in support of the TRO. It is further ORDERED, ADJUGED AND DECREED that this Court Shall retain jurisdiction of this action for the purpose of implementing and enforcing this Final Judgment and Permanent Restraining Order.This Order shall constitute the Final Order in this matter, no other claims orissues remain, and the Clerk is directed to close this matter and vacate the June 6, 2024 hearing. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/31/2024. (ACC)
May 31, 2024 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Order/Judgment and Permanent Restraining Order. Jeana R. Lervick appearing for Plaintiff Great Harvest Franchising. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Final Judgment and Permanent Restraining Order) (Lervick, Jeana)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER Re-Setting Time of Hearing on Motion #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion Hearing is reset for 6/6/2024 at 10:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/29/2024. (SLL)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Continue. The Hearing currently set for May 28, 2024 at 3:30 p.m. is VACATED and continued to June 6, 2024 at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/21/2024. (KAH) Modified on 5/21/2024 to reflect order mailed to Counsel Lervick and parties Gregory and Kimberly Green (TLO).
May 21, 2024 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Continue Temporary Restraining Order and Hearing Date. Jeana R. Lervick appearing for Plaintiff Great Harvest Franchising. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lervick, Jeana)
May 21, 2024 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings. Set Deadlines/Hearings: ( Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2024 at 04:00 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris.) (KAH)
May 17, 2024 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Great Harvest Franchising re 10 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, #9 Order on Motion for TRO (Lervick, Jeana)
May 16, 2024 Filing 11 Surety BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by Great Harvest Franchising. (SAJ)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Per #9 ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2024 at 03:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/14/2024. (SAJ)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/14/2024. (See Order for full details) (SAJ)
May 14, 2024 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Gregory Andrew Williams Green, Kimberly Elaine Green. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Issued Summons - Kimberly Green) (ACC)
May 14, 2024 Filing 7 Submission of Proposed Summons as to Kimberly Elaine Green, re #1 Complaint (Lervick, Jeana)
May 14, 2024 Filing 6 Submission of Proposed Summons as to Gregory Andrew Williams Green, re #1 Complaint (Lervick, Jeana)
May 13, 2024 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great Harvest Franchising identifying Corporate Parent Great Harvest Franchishing, Inc. for Great Harvest Franchising.. (Lervick, Jeana)
May 13, 2024 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Great Harvest Franchising. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of John Michael Ferretti, #2 Exhibit B - Great Harvest Franchise Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Christy Peterson) (Lervick, Jeana)
May 13, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Jeana R. Lervick appearing for Plaintiff Great Harvest Franchising. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed TRO) (Lervick, Jeana). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 5/14/2024 (SAJ).
May 13, 2024 Filing 2 AO 120 Patent and Trademark form transmitted to the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Lervick, Jeana)
May 13, 2024 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Gregory Andrew Williams Green, Kimberly Elaine Green, filed by Great Harvest Franchising. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Great Harvest Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACC)
May 13, 2024 Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number AMTDC-3260800 (ACC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Harvest Franchising v. Green et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Harvest Franchising
Represented By: Jeana R. Lervick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Andrew Williams Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Elaine Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?