Frandsen v. CASCADE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT et al
Plaintiff: |
Roger Frandsen |
Defendant: |
CASCADE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, Great Falls Police Department and Cascade County Detention Center |
Case Number: |
4:2008cv00026 |
Filed: |
April 15, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Montana |
Office: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights Office |
County: |
CASCADE |
Presiding Judge: |
Sam E Haddon |
Presiding Judge: |
Keith Strong |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 30, 2010 |
Filing
87
ORDER adopting Findings and Recommendations 85 in full, and granting Defendant Cascade County's 51 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Defendant City of Great Falls's 55 Motion for Summary Judgment. Any appeal from this disposition will not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 11/30/2010. Mailed to Frandsen. (TAG, )
|
November 3, 2010 |
Filing
85
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Scott Van Dyken, Mellot, CASCADE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, Cascade County Detention Center, Darlington, 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jeff Bragg, Dean Benne tt, Keith Hedges, Travis Palmer, Morgan Kasuske, Eric Baumann. Defendants' Summary Judgment Motions should be GRANTED and the Court should certify that any appeal would not be taken in good faith. Judge Magistrate Keith Strong termed. Objections to F&R due by 11/22/2010. Signed by Magistrate Keith Strong on 11/3/2010. Mailed to Frandsen. (TAG, )
|
October 6, 2010 |
Filing
84
ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 81 in full. 55 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Jeff Bragg, Dean Bennett, Keith Hedges, Travis Palmer, Morgan Kasuske, Eric Baumann is GRANTED as to Defendant Hedges. Plaintiffs claim for excessive use of force against Defendant Keith Hedges is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 10/6/2010. Mailed to Frandsen. (TAG, )
|
June 17, 2010 |
Filing
71
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion to Compel. On or before July 12, 2010, Defendants Darlington and VanDyken shall respond as directed. Defendants shall have until July 12, 2010 to file any amended/supplemental motions for summary judgment. Mr. Frandsen shall have until August 9, 2010 to respond to all pending Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Keith Strong on 6/17/2010. Mailed to Frandsen. (TAG, )
|
December 7, 2009 |
Filing
44
ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 39 in full. 24 Motion to Dismiss filed by Mike Mellot, and 29 Motion to Dismiss filed by Keith Hedges are DENIED. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/7/2009. Copy mailed to Frandsen. (TAG, )
|
November 12, 2009 |
Filing
39
ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's 36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, and Defendant Hedges's 38 MOTION to Strike are DENIED. Defendants Mellot and Hedges's Answers shall be served within 10 days of the date of service o f this Order as indicated on the Notice of Electronic Filing. Defendants Mellot and Hedges's Motions to Dismiss 24 , 29 should be DENIED. Objections to F&R due by 11/30/2009. Signed by Magistrate Keith Strong on 11/12/2009. Copy mailed to Frandsen. (TAG, ) Modified on 11/13/2009 to clarify docket text. (MPB, ).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?