Gordon et al v. New West Health Services et al
Plaintiff: Lance R Gordon and Roni A Gordon
Defendant: New West Health Services
Case Number: 4:2015cv00024
Filed: March 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
County: CASCADE
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 AMENDED FINAL APPROVAL ORDER re 166 MOTION correct errors in Final Approval Order re 165 Order. **SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS**. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/23/2018. (MMS)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/4/2018. (SLR)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER: The Court has been informed that this case settled. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all deadlines in the case are VACATED. The parties shall file a stipulation for dismissal and submit to the undersigned a proposed order of dismissal on or before February 8, 2018, or show good cause for their failure to do so. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/8/2018. (MMS)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting 115 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. All claims for declaratory relief in Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/27/2017. (MMS)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER finding as moot 66 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 101 Motion for Leave to File; finding as moot 102 Motion to Strike. Motions are rendered moot, unless the parties file an objection within ten (10) days of the filing of this Order. If any objections are filed, the underlying motion will remain pending until the Court issues an Order resolving the objection. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/30/2017. (MMS)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 49 Motion To Deny Class Certification ; denying 79 Motion for Class Certification. Plaintiffs possess the Court's permission to amend the Complaint to include a claim for class certification under Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 23(b)(3). Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/25/2017. (MMS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon et al v. New West Health Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance R Gordon
Represented By: Lawrence A. Anderson
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roni A Gordon
Represented By: Lawrence A. Anderson
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New West Health Services
Represented By: Kelsey E. Bunkers
Represented By: Ian McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?