The Phoenix Insurance Company v. Ed Boland Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Phoenix Insurance Company
Defendant: Ed Boland Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv00071
Filed: August 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
County: CASCADE
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying as moot 51 Motion for Attorney Fees Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 4/13/2017. (MMS)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Adopting 43 Findings and Recommendations re 21 Motion for Summary Judgment, 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. 1. Phoenixs 21 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. 2. EBCs 26 Motion for Summary Judgment on Duty to Defend is DENIED. 3. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. 4. All deadlines and hearings are VACATED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/18/2017. (ACC)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. ; denying 19 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/27/2016. (SLL, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Phoenix Insurance Company v. Ed Boland Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Phoenix Insurance Company
Represented By: Annie Harris
Represented By: Marshal L. Mickelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Boland Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?