Stewart v. Mr. Berkebile et al
Plaintiff: Laurence Stewart
Defendant: Mr. Berkebile, Ms. Arnold, Mr. Spiegle, Mr. Weaver, Mike Batista, Loraine Woonik, Colleen Ambrose, Mr. Stewart and John Doe 1-4
Case Number: 4:2015cv00089
Filed: October 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
County: CHOUTEAU
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER denying 176 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; granting 179 Motion for Transcripts; granting 182 Motion for Notice of Appeal; denying 183 Motion to Clarify; granting 184 Application for Taxation of Costs. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/21/2020. Transmitted electronically to prison for delivery to Plaintiff. (TAG)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER denying 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 123 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/23/2019. Mailed to Stewart (TAG)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER adopting in part 104 Findings and Recommendations; granting 70 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 76 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 80 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 100 Motion for Protec tive Order; granting 106 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objection to Findings and Recommendations; granting 107 Revised Motion for Extension of Time to File Objection to Findings and Recommendations; denying 111 Motion for Sanctions. CCA Defendants and Stewart shall file supplemental briefing, and accompanying affidavits as described. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/22/2019. Mailed to Stewart. (TAG)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER ADOPTING 63 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full; denying 60 Motion to Amend; denying 61 Motion to Serve Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/6/2018. Mailed to Stewart (TAG)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 44 in full. Defendant Stewart is DISMISSED. All Fourteenth Amendment claims are also DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/28/2017. Mailed to Stewart. (TAG)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ADOPTING 25 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full; granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/6/2017. Mailed to Stewart (TAG)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 7 in full. All John Doe Defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/15/2016. Mailed to Stewart. (TAG, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Mr. Berkebile et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurence Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Berkebile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Spiegle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loraine Woonik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Ambrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?