Allied World Specialty Insurance Company v. Urban Ranch et al
Plaintiff: Allied World Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Urban Ranch, Murray J. Dighans and Deanne A. Dighans
Case Number: 4:2016cv00089
Filed: August 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
County: DANIELS
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: The docket in this case indicates no activity in nearly two years. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties will file a joint status report with the Court on or before April 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/21/2018. (MMS)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re 34 Suggestion of Bankruptcy filed by Murray J. Dighans, Deanne A. Dighans, Urban Ranch. IS IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is STAYED. All deadlines and hearings in this case are VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 11/8/2016. (MMS, )
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: granting re 30 MOTION John E. Sebastian to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. 1. Local counsel, Mr. Campbell will be designated as lead counsel or as co-lead counsel with Mr. Sebastian. Mr. Seb astian must do his own work. He must do his own writing, sign his own pleadings, motions, briefs and other documents served or filed by him, and, if designated co-lead counsel, must appear and participate personally in all proceedings before the Cour t. Local counsel, Mr. Campbell shall also shall also sign such pleadings, motions and briefs and other documents served or filed. 2. Admission is not granted until Mr. Sebastian, within fifteen (15) daysfrom the date of this Order have filed an acknowledgment and acceptance of hisadmission under the terms set forth above. 3. Admission is personal to Mr. Sebastian. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 10/17/2016. (ACC, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allied World Specialty Insurance Company v. Urban Ranch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied World Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua Ian Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Ranch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray J. Dighans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanne A. Dighans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?