Iserloth v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Mike Edwin Iserloth
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 4:2016cv00114
Filed: November 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
County: CASCADE
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Judge Johnston's 30 Findings and Recommendations, are ADOPTED IN FULL. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Iserloth shall recover attorney's fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act in the amount of $7,042.09. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Iserloth's 20 Application for an Award of Equal Access to Justice Act Fees is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/21/2019. (ACC)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 20 Plaintiff's Application for Award of EAJA Fees is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 4/18/2018. (ACC)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: (SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iserloth v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Edwin Iserloth
Represented By: John E. Seidlitz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?