Sundheim v. JLG Industries Inc
Plaintiff: Jeremy Sundheim
Defendant: JLG Industries Inc
Case Number: 4:2017cv00002
Filed: January 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
County: XX out of state
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 44 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/15/2018. (MMS)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: 41 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order filed by JLG Industries Inc. is GRANTED. Status Conference is set for 10/4/2018 at 10:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Discovery due by 7/27/2018., Motions due by 9/21/2018. Proposed Final Pretrial Order due by 10/25/2018. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/21/2018. (MMS)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/24/2017. (TLO)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO TRANSFER - denied without prejudice 5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; and granting 11 Motion. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (CC, Case Administrator) [Transferred from waed on 1/10/2017.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sundheim v. JLG Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Sundheim
Represented By: Sean Edward Johnson
Represented By: Nicholas D. Kovarik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JLG Industries Inc
Represented By: Robert L Christie
Represented By: Gary M. Zadick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?