Citizens for Clean Energy et al v. U.S. Department of the Interior et al
Case Number: 4:2017cv00030
Filed: March 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
County: CASCADE
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4332 Environmental Policy - Coop of Agency Reports
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs requested relief in their Motions for Summary Judgment (Docs. 115, 117) and Briefs on Remedies (Docs. 147, 153) is DENIED. (SLR)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting (157) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney James Kaste in case 4:17-cv-00030-BMM; granting (138) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 4:17-cv-00042-BMM. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 4/17/2020. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/26/2020. Associated Cases: 4:17-cv-00030-BMM, 4:17-cv-00042-BMM (MMS) Modified on 3/26/2020 to regenerate order to Mr. Kaste (MMS).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER: The Court deems it appropriate to postpone a remedies ruling until after Federal Defendants' completion of their NEPA review. The Court's postponement of a remedies ruling does not foreclose Plaintiffs' ability to challenge the adequacy of Federal Defendants' NEPA review after its completion. The parties shall reserve their rights set forth in the Court's 141 Summary Judgment Order to file briefs within the word limits determined by the Court. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/31/2019. Associated Cases: 4:17-cv-00030-BMM, 4:17-cv-00042-BMM (SLR)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 97 and 99 in CV-17-42-GF-BMM; and 115 and 117 in CV-17-30-GF-BMM are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. It is further ORDERED that Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' Cross-Mot ions for Summary Judgment 105 , 107 , 109 in CV-17-42-GF-BMM; and 123 , 125 , 127 in CV-17-30-GF-BMM are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Entry of judgment will follow the imposition of a remedy in accordance with the above Order. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/19/2019. Associated Cases: 4:17-cv-00030-BMM, 4:17-cv-00042-BMM (MMS)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER: The parties shall comply with the following deadlines and word counts: Federal Defendants to certify, serve, and lodge the second revised administrative record 7/11/18, Opening Brief of Plaintiff in CV-17-30 is 7/27/18, Opening Brief of Plaint iff in CV-17-42 is 7/27/18, Brief of Amicus Curiae Professor Michael Greenstone (5,000 words) 8/3/2018, Federal Defendants' Cross-Motion and Opposition Brief (13,000 words) 9/5/2018, Intervenor-Defendants State of Wyoming and State of Montana� 39;s Joint Cross-Motion and Opposition Brief(7,500 words) 9/19/18, Intervenor-Defendant National Mining Association'sCross-Motion and Opposition Brief 9/19/18, Opposition and Reply Brief of Plaintiff in CV -17-30 is 10/16/2018, Opposition and Re ply Brief of Plaintiff in CV-17-42 is 10/16/2018, Federal Defendants' Reply Brief 11/16/2018, Intervenor-Defendants State of Wyoming and State of Montana's Reply Brief 12/3/2018, Intervenor-Defendant National Mining Association's Reply Brief 12/3/2018.Hearing on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment is set for 12/13/2018 at 10:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/23/2018. Associated Cases: 4:17-cv-00030-BMM, 4:17-cv-00042-BMM (MMS)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting (103) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mark Templeton ; granting (104) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Weinstock in case 4:17-cv-00030-BMM; granting (85) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mark Templeton ; granting (8 6) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Weinstock in case 4:17-cv-00042-BMM. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 7/6/2018. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/21/2018. Associated Cases: 4:17-cv-00030-BMM, 4:17-cv-00042-BMM, (Copy of Order mailed to PHV Counsel Templeton, Counsel Weinstock is a registered user) (MMS) Modified on 6/21/2018 to correct name of attorney in docket text (MMS).
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting (39) Motion to Intervene regarding the State of Montana in case 4:17-cv-00030-BMM Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/10/2017. Associated Cases: 4:17-cv-00030-BMM, 4:17-cv-00042-BMM (MMS)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 Motion to Consolidate Cases. For purposes of briefing and argument, with this action designated as the lead case, to which all filings shall henceforth be made. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS AND DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/2/2017. (MMS)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Intervene. The Defendant-Intervenor State of Wyoming must file all required responsive pleadings in this matter, including an Answer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant-Intervenor State of Wyoming must file its responsive pleading or motion within seven days after the deadline by which Federal Defendants must file their responsive pleading or motion. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/30/2017. (MMS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens for Clean Energy et al v. U.S. Department of the Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?