Cantrell v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Jessica Cantrell
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 4:2017cv00135
Filed: December 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
County: ROOSEVELT
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER denying 95 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/11/2019. (MMS)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (SLR)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER regarding the admissibility of demonstrative exhibits at trial. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/6/2019. (MMS)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 28 Motion for Judicial Notice of Climate Data. The 15 pages of climate dataattached to Defendants Brief in support of Motion for Judicial Notice of ClimateData (ECF 29-1, dated January 7, 2019) is admitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 1/8/2019. (TLO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantrell v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Cantrell
Represented By: Daniel B. Bidegaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?