Turner et al v. Northern Montana Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Audrey Turner, Vicky Byrd, Jennifer Tanner, Linda Larsen, Paul Lee, Brandi Breth, Kate Houlihan and Barb Moser
Defendant: Northern Montana Hospital, St. Peter's Hospital, Bozeman Deaconess Health Services, RCHP Billings-Missoula, LLC and Billings Clinic
Case Number: 4:2017cv00141
Filed: December 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
County: HILL
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting 198 Motion to Seal Document. The Clerk of Court is directed to seal and remove Document 197 from the public docket. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/29/2019. (MMS)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting 166 Motion to file a combined reply brief containing a combined limit of 6,500 words. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/18/2019. (MMS)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting 148 Motion to File Under Seal. The Clerk of Court is directed to seal the following documents and remove them from the public docket: Docs: 132 - 1 and Docs 132 -3. Plaintiff will re-file Docs. 132-1 with pages 16-45, 78-179 and 194-238 redacted and 132-2 with pages 1-15 redacted, linking these documents to Doc. 132. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/25/2019. (MMS)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER: Plaintiffs filed an Amended Complaint on July 11, 2018. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED: 1) Defendant Northern Montana Hospital's 14 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is DENIED as moot; 2) Defendant St. Peter's Health's 16 Mot ion to Dismiss Complaint is DENIED as moot; 3) Defendant RCHP Billings-Missoula, LLC's d/b/a Community Medical Center's 23 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is DENIED as moot; 4) Defendant Bozeman Health's 26 Motion to Dismiss Complaint is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/31/2018. (SLR)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael J. Miller ; granting 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kathleen Abke. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 5/15/2018. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/30/2018. (Copy of order mailed to counsel) (MMS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner et al v. Northern Montana Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Turner
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Michael G. Black
Represented By: John M. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Byrd
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Michael G. Black
Represented By: John M. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Tanner
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Michael G. Black
Represented By: John M. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Larsen
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Michael G. Black
Represented By: John M. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Lee
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Michael G. Black
Represented By: John M. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Breth
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Michael G. Black
Represented By: John M. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kate Houlihan
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Michael G. Black
Represented By: John M. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barb Moser
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Michael G. Black
Represented By: John M. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Montana Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Peter's Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bozeman Deaconess Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCHP Billings-Missoula, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billings Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?