Heavey v. Netflix, Inc.

Plaintiff: Sean R. Heavey
Defendant: Netflix, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00121
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Sean R. Heavey re #5 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Ranta, Katie)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel David C. Deal re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Deal. (ACC)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiffs have moved for the admission of David C. Deal to practice before this Court in this case with Katie R. Ranta and Jason T. Holden to act as local counsel. Mr. Deal's application appears to be in compliance with L.R. 83.1(d). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Plaintiffs' #3 motion to allow Mr. Deal to appear on their behalf is GRANTED on the following conditions: SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Copy of Order mailed to Counsel Deal. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/4/2018. (ACC)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 AO 121 Copyright form transmitted to the U.S. Copyright Office. (Ranta, Katie)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION David C. Deal to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2194561.) Katie Rose Ranta appearing for Plaintiff Sean R. Heavey (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David C. Deal) (Ranta, Katie)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Netflix, Inc. (original mailed to plaintiff's counsel) (TLO)
September 13, 2018 Filing fee: $400, receipt number 0977-2194467 (TLO)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Netflix, Inc., filed by Sean R. Heavey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Civil Cover Sheet, #17 Summons) (TLO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heavey v. Netflix, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean R. Heavey
Represented By: Katie Rose Ranta
Represented By: Jason T. Holden
Represented By: David C. Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netflix, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?