Krampitz v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Crystal L. Krampitz
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 4:2018cv00141
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lars Nelson on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Nelson, Lars)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Originals mailed to Cnls Seidlitz. (ACC)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Krampitz may proceed with this action in forma pauperis, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, without payment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 11/6/2018. (ACC)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Crystal L. Krampitz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summonses) (ACC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2018: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACC). Modified on 11/6/2018 to remove "Lodged". IFP Granted.(ACC).
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis John E. Seidlitz, Jr appearing for Plaintiff Crystal L. Krampitz Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ACC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krampitz v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal L. Krampitz
Represented By: John E. Seidlitz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Lars Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?