Fannie Mae v. Whitford
Plaintiff: Fannie Mae
Defendant: James Whitford
Case Number: 4:2018cv00144
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fannie Mae. James Whitford served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. (Johnson, Steven)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to James Whitford. (original mailed to counsel Johnson for service) (TLO)
November 19, 2018 Filing fee: $400, receipt number 0977-2225798 (TLO)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Whitford, filed by Fannie Mae. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Patent, #2 Exhibit B. Reverse Mortgage App, #3 Exhibit C. Adjustable Rate Note, #4 Exhibit D. Loan Agreement, #5 Exhibit E. Deed of Trust, #6 Exhibit F. Repayment Notice, #7 Summons, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (TLO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fannie Mae v. Whitford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Whitford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fannie Mae
Represented By: Steven M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?