B & L Farm and Ranch, LLP v. Commercial Lynks, Inc., a Virginia Corporation

Plaintiff: B & L Farm and Ranch, LLP
Defendant: Commercial Lynks, Inc., a Virginia Corporation
Case Number: 4:2018cv00145
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 15 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by B & L Farm and Ranch, LLP. (Charles, David)
January 15, 2019 Filing 14 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Commercial Lynks, Inc., a Virginia Corporation. (Snedigar, Daniel)
January 14, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by B & L Farm and Ranch, LLP. (Charles, David)
January 8, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Commercial Lynks, Inc., a Virginia Corporation. (Snedigar, Daniel)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #10 Joint Motion to Participate by Telephone in Preliminary Pretrial Conference is GRANTED. The Court will contact the parties with the call-in number. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/8/2019. (ACC)
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION PARTICIPATE BY TELEPHONE IN THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Daniel L. Snedigar appearing for Defendant Commercial Lynks, Inc., a Virginia Corporation Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Snedigar, Daniel)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by B & L Farm and Ranch, LLP. (Charles, David)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 1/15/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 1/15/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 1/15/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2019 at 02:00 PM in Great Falls, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 12/27/2018. (ACC)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Consent to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains assigned to Honorable Brian Morris and referred to Honorable John Johnston. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 12/19/2018. (ACC)
December 7, 2018 Remark: Original State Court documents placed in brown expando on shelf in Great Falls Clerk's Office. (SLR)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 COMPLAINT (Jury Demand) (State Court) against All Defendants, filed by B & L Farm and Ranch, LLP. (SLR)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Montana Seventeenth Judicial District Court, Phillips County, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 Certification to US Federal Court, #2 State Court Docket, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Return of Service, #5 Consent to Service of Electronic Documents, #6 Issued Summons) (SLR)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Commercial Lynks, Inc., a Virginia Corporation. (Snedigar, Daniel)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 Mailing of Consent - Honorable John Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electronically Mailed to counsel David L. Charles, Daniel L. Snedigar.Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 12/13/2018. (TLO)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND (State Court copy) against Commercial Lynks, Inc., a Virginia Corporation, filed by B & L Farm and Ranch, LLP. (TLO)
November 20, 2018 Filing fee: $400, receipt number 0977-2226339 (TLO)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Commercial Lynks, Inc., a Virginia Corporation from Montana Seventeenth Judicial District, case number DV-2018-33., filed by Commercial Lynks, Inc., a Virginia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (TLO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B & L Farm and Ranch, LLP v. Commercial Lynks, Inc., a Virginia Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Lynks, Inc., a Virginia Corporation
Represented By: Daniel L. Snedigar
Represented By: James A. Patten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B & L Farm and Ranch, LLP
Represented By: David L. Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?