Moore v. Specialty Government Services

Plaintiff: Jacquelyn M. Moore
Defendant: Specialty Government Services
Case Number: 4:2018cv00147
Filed: November 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by Specialty Government Services (Faure, Jean)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 1/16/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 1/16/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 1/16/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2019 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. **See Order for additional detail** Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 12/3/2018. (ACC)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Specialty Government Services. (Faure, Jean)
November 30, 2018 Remark: Original State Court documents placed in brown expando file on shelf in Great Falls Clerk's Office. (SLR)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Jacquelyn M. Moore. (SLR)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Issued Summons) (SLR)
November 23, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2227795. (SLR)
November 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Specialty Government Services from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, Montana, case number DDV-18-0608. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Specialty Government Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn M. Moore
Represented By: Douglas Scotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialty Government Services
Represented By: Katie Rose Ranta
Represented By: Jean E. Faure
Represented By: Jason T. Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?