Nelson v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Art Nelson
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00002
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge having been withheld or met with objection, this case remains assigned to Honorable Brian Morris, United States District Judge and referred to Honorable John Johnston, United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/20/2019. (ACC)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 Mailing of Consent - Honorable John Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Reid Perkins, Ronald A. Bender, Kurt M. Jackson. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 3/25/2019. (TLO)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US LLC identifying Corporate Parent FCA US, LLC, Other Affiliate FCA North American Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V. for FCA US LLC.. (Perkins, Reid)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 FCA US LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FCA US LLC. (Perkins, Reid)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Art Nelson. FCA US LLC served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. (Jackson, Kurt)
January 22, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2252512. (MMS)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. (Original mailed to counsel Jackson) (MMS)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC, filed by Art Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (MMS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Ronald A. Bender
Represented By: Reid Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Art Nelson
Represented By: Kurt M. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?