Smith v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Jennifer J. Smith
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 4:2019cv00006
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Original returned to Cnsl Seidlitz office at clerk's counter. (ACC)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 REPLY TO ORDER re #3 Order, filed by Randall G. Knowles, volunteer representative for Jennifer J. Smith. (SLR)
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Seidlitz, Jr on behalf of Jennifer J. Smith (Seidlitz, John)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1) Smith shall inform the Court on or before March 15, 2019 whether she intends to prosecute this case personally, or proceed with the assistance of an attorney; 2) Should Smith decide to proceed on her own, she must be prepared to draft her own pleadings, briefs and other legal papers, and she must personally appear at all scheduled court hearings; 3) Should Smith decide to retain an attorney, the attorney must file a notice of appearance on or before April 5, 2019; 4) If Smith fails to comply with this Order, the Court may dismiss her Complaint without prejudice. Copy of Order mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 3/5/2019. (SLR)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE - Affidavit of Representation Explanation. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) (ACC)
February 1, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number MTX400013292 (ACC)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Jennifer J. Smith. (ACC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/4/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACC). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/4/2019: #2 Exhibit - A, #3 Exhibit - B, #4 Exhibit - C) (ACC). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/7/2019: #5 Proposed Summonses) (ACC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer J. Smith
Represented By: John E. Seidlitz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?