United States of America v. Holen et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Roosevelt County, Lucille Peterson Holen and Richard Dean Holen
Case Number: 4:2019cv00011
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 USM 285 Return Executed on 4/10/2019 as to Lucille Peterson Holen. (SLR)
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 USM 285 Return Executed on 4/10/2019 as to Richard Holen. (SLR)
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Richard Dean Holen served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/1/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Lucille Peterson Holen served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/1/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summonses Issued as to Lucille Peterson Holen, Richard Dean Holen. (TLO)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION Between United States and Roosevelt County by United States of America. (Francis, Victoria)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Roosevelt County waiver sent on 2/15/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Austin Knudsen, Roosevelt County Attorney on 02/15/2019 by United States of America. Waiver of Service due by 4/16/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Richard Dean Holen on 02/15/2019 by United States of America. Waiver of Service due by 4/16/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Lucille Peterson Holen on 02/15/2019 by United States of America. Waiver of Service due by 4/16/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Holen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roosevelt County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucille Peterson Holen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Dean Holen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?