United States of America v. Magee et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Mark D. Magee, Melanie R. Magee, Blackfeet Tribe and Glacier Bank
Case Number: 4:2019cv00017
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Francis, Victoria)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Melanie R. Magee on 03/19/2019 by United States of America. Waiver of Service due by 5/20/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Mark Magee on 03/19/2019 by United States of America. Waiver of Service due by 5/20/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Glacier Bank on 03/19/2019 by United States of America. Waiver of Service due by 5/20/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Derek Kiline - Blackfeet Legal Department on 03/19/2019 by United States of America. Waiver of Service due by 4/20/2020. (Francis, Victoria)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Magee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark D. Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie R. Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackfeet Tribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glacier Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?