St. Goddard v. Native American Bank
Plaintiff: Rose St. Goddard
Defendant: Native American Bank
Case Number: 4:2019cv00022
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING CASE for a Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference is set for 7/16/2019 at 09:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. **SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS**. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 6/26/2019. (MMS)
June 26, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John Johnston: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/26/2019. (SLL)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER RESETTING: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Telephonic Status Conference is RESET for 6/26/2019 at 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. The Court will contact the parties with the call-in number. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 6/21/2019. (SLL)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John Johnston for the purpose of conducting mediation. ( Telephonic Scheduling Call set for 6/25/2019 at 11:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. The Court will contact parties with the call-in number.) Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/19/2019. (LJM)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth R. Friedman on behalf of Rose St. Goddard (Friedman, Kenneth)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 12/9/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Brian Morris. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/26/2019 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2019 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2019. Discovery due by 9/6/2019. Motions due by 9/27/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/22/2019. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/11/2019. (TLO)
June 11, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE ENTRY for MOTION HEARING and PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held 6/11/19 before Judge Brian Morris: Counsel Terryl Matt and Plaintiff Rose St. Goddard appearing and Counsel Thane Johnson and Preston Rammell appearing on behalf of Defendant. Motion Hearing re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Rose St. Goddard. Parties with argument. If parties wish to have a settlement conference they are to file a joint motion. Court will take this matter under advisement. Court proceeds with Pretrial Conference: Amended Pleadings 7/1/2019, Discovery Deadline 9/6/2019, Motions Deadline (fully briefed) 9/27/2019, Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2019 at 1:30 p.m. Final Pretrial Order 11/22/2019, Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/26/2019, Trial briefs 12/2/19, Bench Trial set for 12/9/2019. Scheduling Order will be filed. Parties have nothing further.Hearing commenced at 1:30 p.m. and concluded at 2:35 p.m. (Court Reporter Becky Sabo.) (Law Clerk: D. Frank and R. Douglas), (Hearing held in Great Falls) (MMS)
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Rose St. Goddard. Amendment to #11 Preliminary Pretrial Statement . (Attachments: #1 Ex. 17 Point Brief re: Wrongfully Withheld Signature Card) (Matt, Terryl)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Native American Bank. (Johnson, Thane)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Native American Bank. (Johnson, Thane)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Native American Bank. (Johnson, Thane)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court,to Counsel Joseph F. Sherwood, Esq. re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Sherwood. (SLR)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Rose St. Goddard. (Matt, Terryl)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Rose St. Goddard. (Attachments: #1 NAB's Motion for Directed Verdict, #2 Rose's Answer to Directed Verdict, #3 Rose's Motion for Attorney's Fees, #4 NAB's Reply Brief Directed, #5 NAB's Response to Attorney's Fees, #6 NAB's Objection To Judgment, #7 Rose's Response to Objection, #8 Blackfeet Tribal Court Order Denying Objection, #9 NAB Notice of Appeal, #10 Rose's Motion to Dismiss Appeal, #11 NAB's Response to MTD) (Matt, Terryl)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Rose St. Goddard. (Matt, Terryl)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Rose St. Goddard. (Attachments: #1 Blackfeet Appellate Court Order) (Matt, Terryl)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Native American Bank. (Johnson, Thane)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/4/2019, Joint Discovery Plan due by 6/4/2019, Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 6/4/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that the undersigned will conduct a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss #5 for Lack of Jurisdiction on 6/11/2019 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/19/2019. (MMS) Modified on 5/9/2019 to reflect Stacy Baldwin will be the Court Reporter for this hearing. (SLR).
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Terryl T. Matt appearing for Counter Defendant Rose St. Goddard (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support) (Matt, Terryl)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM and Demand for Declaratory Judgment against Rose St. Goddard by Native American Bank. (Johnson, Thane)
April 3, 2019 Set Deadlines: Native American Bank answer due 4/16/2019. (SLR)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Thane Johnson, NAB Attorney on 3-26-19, filed by Rose St. Goddard. (Matt, Terryl)
March 21, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number MTX400013440 (MMS)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Native American Bank. (Original summons mailed to counsel Matt) (MMS)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Native American Bank, filed by Rose St. Goddard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1 - Tribal Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 - Counterclaim, #5 Exhibit 3 - Verdict, #6 Exhibit 4 - Judgment) (MMS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Goddard v. Native American Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Native American Bank
Represented By: Thane P. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose St. Goddard
Represented By: Terryl T. Matt
Represented By: Joseph F. Sherwood
Represented By: Kenneth R. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?