Lapke et al v. Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutal Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Brenna Lapke and Matthew Lapke
Defendant: John Does 1-5, ABC Companies 1-3 and Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00035
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The parties have #8 jointly moved to vacate the Preliminary Pretrial Conference. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the Preliminary Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for Wednesday, June 26, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. and the deadlines in the Court's May 8, 2019 #4 Order are VACATED to allow the parties to continue gathering records necessary for complete evaluation of the claims and potential resolution. The parties will file a joint status report with the court on or before July 26, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 6/12/2019. (ACC)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Vacate #4 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order, and Associated Deadlines Bradley J. Luck appearing for Defendant Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Luck, Bradley)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John Johnston (ACC)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENTS TO USMJ. (ACC)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Luck, Bradley)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/19/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 6/19/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 6/19/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2019 at 03:00 PM in Great Falls, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 5/8/2019. (MMS)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Luck, Bradley)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Mailing of Consent - Honorable John T. Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Channing Hartelius, Bradley J. Luck. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 5/28/2019. (MMS)
May 7, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2306152 (MMS)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, Case Number CDV-19-0200. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Insurance Commissioner Letter) (MMS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lapke et al v. Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutal Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Companies 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradley J. Luck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenna Lapke
Represented By: Channing Hartelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Lapke
Represented By: Channing Hartelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?