Knox et al v. Monsanto Company et al

Plaintiff: Terry Knox and Carolyn "Coke&quot Knox
Defendant: Kerry Yates and Monsanto Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00036
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE by Monsanto Company, Kerry Yates of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PowerPoint Presentation) (Cox, Randy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Brian Morris. Counsel Edwards and Culver present on behalf of plaintiffs. Counsel Cox and Gray present on behalf of defendants. Motion Hearing held on 7/10/2019 re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Kerry Yates, #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Carolyn "Coke" Knox, Terry Knox Cnsl Culver w/argument. Cnsl Cox w/response. Cnsl Edwards w/rebuttal. Court takes matter under advisement. Hearing commenced at 11:48 and concluded at 12:48. (Court Reporter Yvette Heinze.) (Law Clerk: J. Brown and R. Douglas), (Hearing held in Great Falls, Charles Pray Courtroom) (TLO)
July 3, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Kerry Yates. (Cox, Randy)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The Motion Hearing in this case set for 7/31/19 is VACATED and RESET for 7/10/2019 at 11:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. #20 MOTION to Vacate Hearing filed by Carolyn "Coke" Knox, Terry Knox is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/27/2019. (MMS)
June 25, 2019 Filing 21 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #20 MOTION to Vacate Hearing filed by Carolyn "Coke" Knox, Terry Knox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A JPML Notice of Hearing Session (Doc 1054)) (Culver, Triel)
June 25, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Vacate Hearing Triel D. Culver appearing for Plaintiffs Carolyn "Coke" Knox, Terry Knox (Culver, Triel)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Carolyn "Coke" Knox, Terry Knox. (Culver, Triel)
June 19, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Carolyn "Coke" Knox, Terry Knox. (Culver, Triel)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION to Remand , #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Motion Hearing is set for 7/31/2019 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/11/2019. (SLL)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Monsanto Company, Kerry Yates. (Cox, Randy)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Upon review of #14 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file their brief in opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall have to and including June 10, 2019, within which to file their brief in opposition to #8 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/10/2019. (ACC)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #8 MOTION to Remand Randy J. Cox appearing for Defendants Monsanto Company, Kerry Yates (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cox, Randy)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for June 12, 2019 is VACATED, to be reset by further Order of the Court. The parties shall periodically advise the Court of the status of the proceedings before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/30/2019. (SLR)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Kerry Yates. (Cox, Randy)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Randy J. Cox appearing for Defendant Kerry Yates (Cox, Randy)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Vacate Preliminary Pretrial Conference Triel D. Culver appearing for Plaintiffs Carolyn "Coke" Knox, Terry Knox (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Briefing Schedule re Motion to Vacate CTO-133, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Culver, Triel)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Carolyn "Coke" Knox, Terry Knox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Caven v. BNSF Order 2004-09-22) (Culver, Triel)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand Triel D. Culver appearing for Plaintiffs Carolyn "Coke" Knox, Terry Knox (Culver, Triel)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Complaint with Jury Demand by Kerry Yates. (Cox, Randy)
May 17, 2019 Remark: Original State Court documents placed in brown expando file on shelf in Clerk's Office. (SLR)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Terry Knox, Carolyn "Coke" Knox. (SLR)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference, #4 Order Substituting Judge, #5 Affidavit of Service - Yates, #6 Affidavit of Service - Monsanto, #7 Motion for Substitution of Judge, #8 Issued Summons - Monsanto, #9 Issued Summons - Yates) (SLR)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/5/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 6/5/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 6/5/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2019 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/13/2019. (MMS)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company.. (Cox, Randy)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Monsanto Company. (Cox, Randy)
May 13, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2308717 (MMS)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, Case Number DDV-19-0211. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Kerry Yates, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (MMS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knox et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Yates
Represented By: Randy J. Cox
Represented By: Robert E. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Randy J. Cox
Represented By: Robert E. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Knox
Represented By: Triel D. Culver
Represented By: A. Clifford Edwards
Represented By: A. Christopher Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn "Coke&quot Knox
Represented By: Triel D. Culver
Represented By: A. Clifford Edwards
Represented By: A. Christopher Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?