Liberty Mutual Insurance Company v. James Talcott Construction et al
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: The Bradley B. Talcott Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013, The Linda K. Caricaburu Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013, Talcott Holdings, Linda K. Caricaburu, Autumn N. Perry, Bradley B. Talcott, Talcott Properties, James Talcott Construction, Talcott Construction and Aaron L. Perry
Case Number: 4:2019cv00050
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Autumn N. Perry. (Zadick, Gary)
September 20, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company by Bradley B. Talcott, Linda K. Caricaburu, The Linda K. Caricaburu Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013, James Talcott Construction, The Bradley B. Talcott Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013, Talcott Properties. (Zadick, Gary)
September 18, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Aaron L. Perry, Talcott Construction, Talcott Holdings(Inc. ), Talcott Holdings(LLC). (Rausch, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Upon #18 Stipulation of the parties, and the Court's #13 Order at the hearing on September 6, 2019, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will withhold ruling on the Verified Motion for Temporary Restraining Order until after Friday, September 20, 2019 at 5:00 p.m. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that during this extension, the asset freeze currently in effect shall remain in effect, and that the parties will consider entering into a collateral agreement to be put in place before September 20, 2019. Absent the foregoing, no further extensions of time will be granted with respect to the Court making a ruling on the Verified Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/16/2019. (SLR)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the Stipulation Regarding Verified Motion for Temporary Restraining Order - Autumn N. Perry, #16 and being fully advised, hereby rules as follows. The Stipulation #16 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/16/2019. (MMS)
September 13, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION re #13 Motion Hearing,,,,,, by Linda K. Caricaburu, James Talcott Construction, Bradley B. Talcott, Talcott Properties, The Bradley B. Talcott Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013, The Linda K. Caricaburu Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013. (Bjelland, Gary)
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order With Notice - Request For Immediate Hearing MOTION for Hearing filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Cantrell, Connor)
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order With Notice - Request For Immediate Hearing MOTION for Hearing As to Autumn N. Perry by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Cantrell, Connor) Modified on 9/16/2019 to change event into a stipulated motion (MMS).
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order With Notice - Request For Immediate Hearing MOTION for Hearing As to Autumn N. Perry by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Cantrell, Connor)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary M. Zadick on behalf of Linda K. Caricaburu, James Talcott Construction, Autumn N. Perry, Bradley B. Talcott, Talcott Properties, The Bradley B. Talcott Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013, The Linda K. Caricaburu Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013 (Zadick, Gary)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY for MOTION HEARING held 9/6/2019 before Judge Brian Morris: Attorney Connor Cantrell appearing on behalf of Plaintiff and Attorneys Gary Bjelland, Gary Zadick, Michael Rausch, and Steven Fitzpatrick appearing on behalf of Defendants. Motion Hearing held on 9/6/2019 re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order With Notice - Request For Immediate Hearing. Attorney Zadick informs the Court that a Stipulation was reached regarding Autumn Perry and reads stipulation into the record. A signed stipulation will be filed. Mr. Zadick will be entering notice of appearances as to the remaining defendants he is representing. Attorneys with argument. Plaintiff calls WITNESS: Christine Bartholdt, S/T. Exhibits 2,4,5,6,7 that are attached to Motion #4 are admitted for the purposes of this hearing. Exhibit 500, ADMITTED. Defense calls WITNESSES: Brad Talcott, Aaron Perry, S/T. Parties with closing arguments. Court will hold in abeyance for one week before ruling on Motion. This will allow parties to mutually agree upon a temporary retraining order. All defendants are enjoined in selling, transferring, wasting, incumbering or otherwise disposing of assets and property except in the ordinary course of business. This is in effect until September 13, 2019 at 5:00 p.m. (Hearing commenced at 10:04 a.m. and concluded at 12:30 p.m.) (Court Reporter Yvette Heinze.) (Law Clerk: C. Kroshus), (Hearing held in Great Falls) (MMS) (MMS). Modified on 9/6/2019 to attach Exhibit 500. (MMS).
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order With Notice - Request For Immediate Hearing MOTION for Hearing POINT BRIEF filed by Aaron L. Perry, Talcott Construction, Talcott Holdings(Inc. ), Talcott Holdings(LLC). (Rausch, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Rausch on behalf of Aaron L. Perry, Talcott Construction, Talcott Holdings(Inc. ), Talcott Holdings(LLC) (Rausch, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary W. Bjelland on behalf of Linda K. Caricaburu, James Talcott Construction, Bradley B. Talcott, Talcott Properties, The Bradley B. Talcott Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013, The Linda K. Caricaburu Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013 (Bjelland, Gary)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Autumn N. Perry waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Cantrell, Connor)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Aaron L. Perry waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019; Talcott Construction waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019; Talcott Holdings(Inc. ) waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019; Talcott Holdings(LLC) waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Cantrell, Connor)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Linda K. Caricaburu waiver sent on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019; James Talcott Construction waiver sent on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019; Bradley B. Talcott waiver sent on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019; Talcott Properties waiver sent on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019; The Bradley B. Talcott Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013 waiver sent on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019; The Linda K. Caricaburu Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013 waiver sent on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Cantrell, Connor)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order With Notice - Request For Immediate Hearing MOTION for Hearing : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Motion Hearing is set for 9/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/29/2019. (SLL)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Correction: re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND Request For Immediate Hearing. The filing error relates to: Multiple Motion Types Not Selected. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (SLR)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND Request For Immediate Hearing Connor L. Cantrell appearing for Plaintiff Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bond 023018322, #2 Exhibit 2 - Bond 67S201456, #3 Exhibit 3 - Bond 67S201454, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2002 General Agreement of Indemnity, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2017 General Agreement of Indemnity, #6 Exhibit 6 - June 17, 2019 Letter, #7 Exhibit 7 - June 26, 2019 Letter, #8 Text of Proposed Order Order on Forthwith Verified Motion for Temporary Restraining Order) (Cantrell, Connor). Added MOTION for Hearing on 8/29/2019 (SLR). Modified on 8/29/2019 to clean up text. (SLR).
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Linda K. Caricaburu, James Talcott Construction, Aaron L. Perry, Autumn N. Perry, Bradley B. Talcott, Talcott Construction, Talcott Holdings(Inc. ), Talcott Holdings(LLC), Talcott Properties, The Bradley B. Talcott Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013, The Linda K. Caricaburu Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013. (originals mailed to Cnsl Cantrell for service) (TLO)
July 26, 2019 Remark: Connor Cantrell is now a registered CM/ECF electronic user. (SLR)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to Counsel Connor L. Cantrell re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Cantrell. (SLR)
July 24, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2342259. (SLR)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company v. James Talcott Construction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bradley B. Talcott Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013
Represented By: Gary W. Bjelland
Represented By: Gary M. Zadick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Linda K. Caricaburu Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013
Represented By: Gary W. Bjelland
Represented By: Gary M. Zadick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talcott Holdings
Represented By: Michael L. Rausch
Represented By: Steven John Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda K. Caricaburu
Represented By: Gary W. Bjelland
Represented By: Gary M. Zadick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autumn N. Perry
Represented By: Gary M. Zadick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley B. Talcott
Represented By: Gary W. Bjelland
Represented By: Gary M. Zadick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talcott Properties
Represented By: Gary W. Bjelland
Represented By: Gary M. Zadick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Talcott Construction
Represented By: Gary W. Bjelland
Represented By: Gary M. Zadick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talcott Construction
Represented By: Michael L. Rausch
Represented By: Steven John Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron L. Perry
Represented By: Michael L. Rausch
Represented By: Steven John Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Connor L. Cantrell
Represented By: Patrick Q. Hustead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?