Pravazabojovnik v. ThirstyHuff et al
Plaintiff: Katherine Pravazabojovnik
Defendant: Jason Hufford, ThirstyHuff and Stephen Thurston
Case Number: 4:2020cv00019
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Katherine Pravazabojovnik. ThirstyHuff waiver sent on 4/3/2020, answer due 6/2/2020. (Sherwood, Frederick)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Katherine Pravazabojovnik. Stephen Thurston waiver sent on 4/3/2020, answer due 6/2/2020. (Sherwood, Frederick)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Jason Hufford on 4-3-2020, filed by Katherine Pravazabojovnik., Proof of Service filed by Katherine Pravazabojovnik. Service by Waiver of Service of Summons on 4-3-20., WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Katherine Pravazabojovnik. Jason Hufford waiver sent on 4/3/2020, answer due 6/2/2020. (Sherwood, Frederick)
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Katherine Pravazabojovnik Consent to Join (Sherwood, Frederick)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Original Summons mailed to Counsel Sherwood. (Attachments: Issued Summons - Thirsty Huff #1 Issued Summons - Hufford, #2 Issued Summons - Thurston) (SLR)
March 5, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2452809. (SLR)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Katherine Pravazabojovnik. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Blank Summons - Thirsty Huff, #3 Blank Summons - Hufford, #4 Blank Summons - Thurston) (SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pravazabojovnik v. ThirstyHuff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Pravazabojovnik
Represented By: Frederick F. Sherwood
Represented By: Anne E. Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Hufford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ThirstyHuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Thurston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?