Roundine v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Laura Roundine
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 4:2020cv00047
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 62 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to Counsel Pamela Lawrence CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Lawrence. (ACC)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: Defendants have moved for admission of Pamela Lawrence (Ms. Lawrence), to practice before this Court in this case with Maxon R. Davis of Davis, Hatley, Haffeman & Tighe, P.C., to act as local counsel. Ms. Lawrence's application appears to be in compliance with L.R. 83.1(d). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Defendants' #60 motion to allow Ms. Lawrence to appear on its behalf is GRANTED on the following conditions: **SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS** Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/3/2020. (ACC)
July 30, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION Pamela Lawrence to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2519686.) Maxon R. Davis appearing for Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Pamela Lawrence, #2 Exhibit Lawrence Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order Admitting Pamela Lawrence PHV) (Davis, Maxon)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/4/2021 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Jury Trial set for 8/9/2021 at 09:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2021 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Discovery due by 2/15/2021. Motions due by 5/15/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/16/2021. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR ALL DEADLINES AND DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/22/2020. (MMS) Modified on 7/27/2020 to correct typo of motions deadline. (MMS).
July 22, 2020 Filing 58 MINUTE ENTRYfor TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held 7/22/2020 before Judge Brian Morris: Counsel Amanda Kurecian and John Kitzpatrick appearing on behalf of Plaintiffs and Counsel Anita Truran and Max Davis appearing on behalf of Defendants. Court reviews the proposed scheduling order. Parties discuss agreed deadlines. Parties agree with August 09, 2021 for a trial date. Final Pretrial Conference will be held August 4, 2021 at 1:00 p.m. Daubert Hearing/Science day May 26, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. in Great Falls. Court discusses pending motions and directs parties to file stipulate motion regarding claims to be dismissed on summary judgment and the claims that will be moving forward on or before August 5, 2020. (Hearing commenced at 2:30 p.m. and concluded at 2:48 p.m.) (Court Reporter Yvette Heinze.) (Law Clerk: V. Dettman), (Hearing held in Great Falls) (MMS)
July 20, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson re #46 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Modak-Truran, Anita)
July 15, 2020 Filing 56 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q) (Davis, Maxon)
July 15, 2020 Filing 55 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Davis, Maxon)
July 15, 2020 Filing 54 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Davis, Maxon)
July 14, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Laura Roundine (Chance, Jody)
July 14, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Laura Roundine (Kurecian, Amanda)
July 14, 2020 Remark: PHV Counsel Jody Chance is now a registered, electronic CM/ECF user. (SLR)
July 13, 2020 Filing 51 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel Chance re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Chance. (SLR)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Plaintiff's #48 and #49 Motions to allow Mr. Chance and Ms. Kurecian to appear are GRANTED, on the following conditions: SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS AND DEADLINE. Order mailed to Counsel Chance. Counsel Kurecian is a registered user. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 7/31/2020. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/13/2020. (SLR) Modified on 7/13/2020 to clean up text. (SLR).
July 13, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION Amanda Kurecian to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2509808.) John M. Fitzpatrick appearing for Plaintiff Laura Roundine (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Amanda Kurecian, #2 Certification Amanda Kurecian, #3 Text of Proposed Order Allowing Amanda Kurecian Pro Hac Vice) (Fitzpatrick, John)
July 13, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION Jody Chance to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2509788.) John M. Fitzpatrick appearing for Plaintiff Laura Roundine (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jody Chance, #2 Certification Jody Chance, #3 Text of Proposed Order Allowing Jody Chance to appear Pro Hac Vice) (Fitzpatrick, John)
July 13, 2020 Filing 47 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to Counsel Anita Modak Truran re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Truran. (ACC)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Defendants have moved for admission of Anita Modak Truran, to practice before this Court in this case with Maxon R. Davis of Davis, Hatley, Haffeman & Tighe, P.C., to act as local counsel. Ms. Truran's application appears to be in compliance with L.R. 83.1(d). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Defendants' #45 motion to allow Ms. Truran to appear on its behalf is GRANTED on the following conditions:**SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS** Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/13/2020. (ACC)
July 10, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION Anita Modak-Truran to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2508521.) Maxon R. Davis appearing for Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anita Modak-Truran, #2 Exhibit Cerification of AMT, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, Maxon)
July 8, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Fitzpatrick on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fitzpatrick, John)
June 15, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel: Daniel R. Higginbotham; Christy D. Jones; Christopher D. Morris; Susan M. Robinson; David B. Thomas; Philip J. Combs and William M. Gage withdrawing from the case, filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Davis, Maxon)
June 15, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Maxon R. Davis on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Davis, Maxon)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 7/15/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 7/15/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 7/15/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2020 at 02:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/8/2020. (MMS) Modified on 7/15/2020 TO REFLECT THE PPTC WILL BE ON THE RECORD. COURT REPORTER HAS BEEN NOTIFIED. (SLR).
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER; All parties appearing pro hac vice must follow the procedure set forth in Local Rule 83.1(d), by June 29, 2020, in order to properly appear before this Court. Local Rule 83.1(d)(2), requires a non-member attorney who does not reside in Montana to obtain the name, address, telephone number, and written consent of local counsel who is a member of the bar of this Court and whom the court and opposing counsel may readily communicate regarding the conduct of the case, upon whom documents will be served. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/8/2020. (TLO)
June 5, 2020 Filing 39 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-33420. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (SLR, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 38 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #27 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2205) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 3 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2206) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2297) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2825) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2826) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2942) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3053) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (7298) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (7406) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 37 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #27 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1986) - Pls' Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1988) - Pls' Amended Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2143) - Defs Resp to Pls' Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3844) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (7329) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (7455) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 36 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #27 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) - Defs' Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (7346) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Tim Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7461) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (7467) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 35 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #27 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2417) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Robert Rogers, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2466) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Robert Rogers, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2488) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Robert Rogers, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (7308) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Robert Rogers, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (7435) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Robert Rogers)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 34 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #27 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3673) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Michael Fiegen, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3676) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Fiegen, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3770) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Michael Fiegen, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (7279) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Michael Fiegen, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (7393) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Michael Fiegen)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 33 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #27 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2075) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2078) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2172) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2214) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2759) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (7335) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (7362) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 32 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #27 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2251) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3621) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3865) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (7343) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (7449) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (7466) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 31 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #27 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2066) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2070) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 1- Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 5 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 6 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 7 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 8 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 9 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 10 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 11 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 12 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 13 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 14 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 15 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 30 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #27 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2188) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2200) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3630) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (3855) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (7334) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (7356) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (7446) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Reply to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 29 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #27 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1978) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 10 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 11 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 12 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 13 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 14 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 15 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 16 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 17- Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 18 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 19 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 20 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (1982) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 28 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #27 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2049) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2241) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (5482) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (7342) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (7364) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 27 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) - First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) - Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) - Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) - Amended Short Form Complaint)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 06/05/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 06/04/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/22/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 25 RESPONSE by Laura Roundine in opposition to #23 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson in support of #23 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Combs, Philip) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Combs, Philip) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Plaintiff's Friends and Family Members on dates and at times to be determined. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Deirdre C. Masterton on 10/30/2018 at 1:00 p.m. (Attachment: #1 Subpoena)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/15/2018 to remove party filer)(rmc). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production. (Morris, Christopher) (Modified on 9/17/2018 to remove party filers)(rmc) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Laura Roundine for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 16 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Laura Roundine on 9/7/18 at 9:00 a.m. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Laura Roundine on 9/7/18 at 2:00 p.m. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Daniel R. Higginbotham on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Higginbotham, Daniel) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Philip J. Combs on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Combs, Philip) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Susan M. Robinson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 11 NON-REVISION ELECTION FORM: Continuing with the presently pending case without any waiver pursuant to the Pretrial Order; filed by Laura Roundine. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL ORDER # 298 FIRST AMENDED ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITION OF NON-REVISION GYNECARE TVT PRODUCTS CASES This amended order revises certain future deadlines and addresses filing instructions regarding the Ethicon Election Form; the Order has been amended at paragraphs 2-5, paragraph 8(B)-(H), and Exhibit B; however, the remainder of this Order is substantively identical to PTO No. 293; if a plaintiff has already filed her Ethicon Election Form pursuant to the deadlines imposed by PTO No. 293, she is not required to re-file an Election Form; if an Election Form has not been filed it must be filed in each individual member case no later than 7/10/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/15/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on the Second Amended Exhibit A) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL ORDER # 293 ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITION OF NON-REVISION GYNECARE TVT PRODUCTS CASES The Motion filed at ECF No. 5313 in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Order Regarding Disposition of Non-Revision Gynecare TVT Products Cases is GRANTED; each Non-Revised Plaintiff identified on the Second Amended Exhibit "A", together with any of her derivative plaintiffs with an existing MDL lawsuit, shall file an election form (Exhibit B to this Order) in each individual case no later than 6/10/2018; the deadlines for discovery and trial preparation procedures are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/11/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on the Second Amended Exhibit A) (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Deirdre C. Masterton on 5/16/18 at 9:00 am (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 16, 2017 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Laura Roundine. (Gomez, Christopher) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
January 27, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
March 14, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
January 22, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
January 11, 2014 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 92 (Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Nonparty Documents) entered on 01/07/2014 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (klc) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
December 27, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2866935. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Service Under Delayed Filing Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tmh) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roundine v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Roundine
Represented By: Lee B. Balefsky
Represented By: Michelle L. Tiger
Represented By: Christopher A. Gomez
Represented By: John M. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Jody Chance
Represented By: Amanda Kurecian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Christopher D. Morris
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Philip J. Combs
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Daniel R. Higginbotham
Represented By: Pamela Lawrence
Represented By: Maxon R. Davis
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, LLC
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Christopher D. Morris
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Philip J. Combs
Represented By: Pamela Lawrence
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Christopher D. Morris
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Philip J. Combs
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Daniel R. Higginbotham
Represented By: Pamela Lawrence
Represented By: Maxon R. Davis
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?