Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company v. Ledeau et al
Plaintiff: Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Megan Ledeau and Timothy Edwards
Case Number: 4:2020cv00071
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Zadick, James)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Zadick on behalf of Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company (Zadick, James)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Timothy Edwards, Megan Ledeau. (Dubois, Neal)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Zadick, Gary)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Zadick, Gary)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Zadick, Gary)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Response to Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Zadick, Gary)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 FILED USING INCORRECT EVENT - CORRECT DOCUMENT IS #6 . PLAINTIFF/COUNTER DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO #3 COUNTERCLAIM FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Zadick, Gary) Modified on 9/11/2020 to clean up text. (SLR). Modified on 9/11/2020 to add language at beginning. (SLR).
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 9/30/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 9/30/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 9/30/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2020 at 02:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/24/2020. (SLR)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company by Megan Ledeau, Timothy Edwards. (Dubois, Neal)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Timothy Edwards, Megan Ledeau. (Attachments: #1 Issued Summons - Edwards) (ACC) Modified on 8/6/2020 (Emailed to service copies to cnsl) (ACC).
August 6, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2522633 (ACC)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for DECLARATORY RELIEF against Timothy Edwards, Megan Ledeau, filed by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company v. Ledeau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary M. Zadick
Represented By: James R. Zadick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Ledeau
Represented By: Jesse Myers
Represented By: Neal P. Dubois
Represented By: Eric Daniel Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Edwards
Represented By: Jesse Myers
Represented By: Neal P. Dubois
Represented By: Eric Daniel Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?