Kleinschmidt v. Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kristy Kleinschmidt
Defendant: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00074
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for October 28, 2020, at 4:00 pm is hereby vacated, as is the deadline for parties to file their preliminary pretrial statements. The parties shall file a stipulation for dismissal and submit a proposed order of dismissal to the undersigned on or before November 21, 2020, or show good cause for their failure to do so. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/21/2020. (SLR)
October 21, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Preliminary Pretrial Conference Stephanie A. Oblander appearing for Defendant Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Vacating Prelim Pretrial Conf) (Oblander, Stephanie)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Kristy Kleinschmidt. (Levine, Michele)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Kristy Kleinschmidt. (Levine, Michele)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER; Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/21/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/21/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/21/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2020 at 04:00 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/22/2020. (TLO)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Honorable Brian Morris. The referral is TERMINATED and the Honorable Magistrate Judge John Johnston no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/22/2020. (ACC)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 Mailing of Consent - Honorable John Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electroncially mailed to counsel Stephanie A. Oblander, Kaitlyn J. McArthur, Michele Reinhart Levine, J. Kim Schulke. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 9/21/2020. (ACC)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Oblander, Stephanie)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Oblander, Stephanie)
September 2, 2020 Remark: Original State Court documents from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, placed in brown expando on back shelf in Clerk's Office. (ACC)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT (State Court) and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Kristy Kleinschmidt. (ACC)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Issued Summons - CT Corporation, #4 Summons Return Served) (ACC)
August 25, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2532732 (ACC)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from MT Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, case number CDV-20-0392. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - CT Transmittal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Issued Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court Docket, #5 Exhibit 5 - Policy Docs, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kleinschmidt v. Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Kleinschmidt
Represented By: Michele Reinhart Levine
Represented By: J. Kim Schulke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kaitlyn J. McArthur
Represented By: Stephanie A. Oblander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?